Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3489849

EP3489849 - PROTECTION OF LOGIN PROCESSES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.12.2019
Database last updated on 17.02.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  26.06.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  03.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 01.01.2020  [2020/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1
80333 München / DE
[2019/22]
Inventor(s)01 / Kirchner, Michael
Unterhachinger Straße 33a
81737 München / DE
02 / Vamos, Benedikt
Lilienthalstr. 22
85579 Neubiberg / DE
 [2019/22]
Application number, filing date17203075.122.11.2017
[2019/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3489849
Date:29.05.2019
Language:EN
[2019/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3489849
Date:01.01.2020
Language:EN
[2020/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.02.2018
ClassificationInternational:G06F21/31, H04L29/06
[2019/22]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/22]
TitleGerman:SCHUTZ VON LOGIN-PROZESSEN[2019/22]
English:PROTECTION OF LOGIN PROCESSES[2019/22]
French:PROTECTION DES PROCESSUS D'OUVERTURE DE SESSION[2019/22]
Examination procedure29.03.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.04.2018Examination requested  [2019/22]
05.04.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
24.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.09.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.06.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.10.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
17.10.2019Fee for grant paid
17.10.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0941524  (BRITISH TELECOMM [GB]) [Y] 1-16 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0033] *
 [Y]  - Maximilian Golla ET AL, ""I want my money back!" Limiting Online Password-Guessing Financially", Symposium on Usable Privacy and Security (SOUPS) 2017, Santa Clara, California, (20170714), pages 1 - 6, URL: https://www.usenix.org/system/files/way2017-golla.pdf, (20180126), XP055444957 [Y] 1-16 * Section 1 * * Section 3.1 * * Section 3.2.2 * * Section 4.1 * * Section 4.3 * * figure 1 *