Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3490191

EP3490191 - PROCESSING METHOD OF SERVICE REQUESTS PERFORMED BY A SERVICE PROVIDER NODE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  13.12.2019
Database last updated on 19.02.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.09.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  10.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.12.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 15.01.2020  [2020/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1
80333 München / DE
[2019/22]
Inventor(s)01 / Kirchner, Michael
Unterhachinger Straße 33a
81737 München / DE
02 / Vamos, Benedikt
Lilienthalstr. 22
85579 Neubiberg / DE
 [2019/22]
Application number, filing date17203081.922.11.2017
[2019/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3490191
Date:29.05.2019
Language:EN
[2019/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3490191
Date:15.01.2020
Language:EN
[2020/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.02.2018
ClassificationInternational:H04L9/32, G06Q20/06, G06Q20/40
[2019/22]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/22]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON DURCH EINEN DIENSTANBIETERKNOTEN AUSGEFÜHRTEN DIENSTANFORDERUNGEN[2019/22]
English:PROCESSING METHOD OF SERVICE REQUESTS PERFORMED BY A SERVICE PROVIDER NODE[2019/22]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE DEMANDES DE SERVICE EFFECTUÉES PAR UN NOEUD DE FOURNISSEUR DE SERVICES[2019/22]
Examination procedure19.02.2018Examination requested  [2019/22]
19.02.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
21.02.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.06.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.07.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.06.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.07.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.09.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.12.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
05.12.2019Fee for grant paid
05.12.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO2017145018  (NCHAIN HOLDINGS LTD [AG]) [X] 1,10-12,14,15 * paragraphs [0005] , [0013] - [0014] - [0057] - [0062] - [0 68] - [0094]; figure 3 * [Y] 2-9,13;
 [YA]US5715314  (PAYNE ANDREW C [US], et al) [Y] 2-9 * column 4, line 50 - column 9, line 50; figures 2A-2I, 3A-3B, 4A-4C * [A] 1,10-15;
 [YA]US2015278397  (HENDRICKSON JOSHUA SAMUEL [US], et al) [Y] 13 * paragraphs [0243] - [0244]; figure 45 * [A] 1-12,14,15
Examination   - Maximilian Golla ET AL, ""I want my money back!" Limiting Online Password-Guessing Financially", Symposium on Usable Privacy and Security (SOUPS) 2017, Santa Clara, California, (20170714), pages 1 - 6, URL: https://www.usenix.org/system/files/way2017-golla.pdf, (20180126), XP055444957