Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3348520

EP3348520 - OZONATED DI-WATER (DIO3) RECIRCULATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  25.02.2019
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  25.01.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MKS Instruments, Inc.
2 Tech Drive, Suite 201
Andover, MA 01810 / US
[2018/29]
Inventor(s)01 / SEIWERT, Johannes Heinrich
Swienemuender Str. 74
13355 Berlin / DE
02 / BRAMMER, Ulrich Alfred
Malplaquetstr. 25
13347 Berlin / DE
03 / BLACHA, Martin
Voigtstr. 12
10247 Berlin / DE
04 / SCHNAITER, Gerhard Joachim
Drosselsteig 29
15827 Blankenfelde / DE
 [2018/29]
Representative(s)Lang, Johannes
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[2018/29]
Application number, filing date17204270.704.11.2013
[2018/29]
Priority number, dateUS201261724006P08.11.2012         Original published format: US 201261724006 P
US20131383684215.03.2013         Original published format: US201313836842
[2018/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3348520
Date:18.07.2018
Language:EN
[2018/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.06.2018
ClassificationInternational:C02F1/20, G03F7/42, H01L21/02, C02F1/78, C02F103/34
[2018/29]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/09]
Former [2018/29]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:REZIRKULATIONSSYSTEM VON OZONIERTEM ENTIONISIERTEM WASSER (DIO3)[2018/29]
English:OZONATED DI-WATER (DIO3) RECIRCULATION SYSTEM[2018/29]
French:SYSTÈME DE RECIRCULATION D'EAU DI OZONÉE (DIO3)[2018/29]
Examination procedure15.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/09]
15.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
28.02.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.09.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP13799418.2  / EP2917152
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
29.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
29.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
27.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
27.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2003136334  (NOVAK RICHARD [US], et al) [X] 1-4,15-17,19,20 * figure 1 * [I] 5-14,18,21-23;
 [XI]US2006021634  (LIU ZHI LEWIS [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,8,9,11,15-17,20 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0025] * [I] 3,5-7,10,12-14,18,19,21-23