Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473499

EP3473499 - MOUNTING MECHANISM FOR VEHICLE SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.04.2019Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
10.04.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 24.04.2019  [2019/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CUB Elecparts Inc.
No. 6, Ln. 546, Sec. 6
Zhanglu Rd.
Fuxing Township
Changhua County / TW
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / YU, San-Chuan
NO. 6, LN. 546, SEC. 6, ZHANGLU RD., FUXING
TOWNSHIP
CHANGHUA COUNTY / TW
02 / YU, Yu-Tao
NO. 6, LN. 546, SEC. 6, ZHANGLU RD., FUXING
TOWNSHIP
CHANGHUA COUNTY / TW
03 / HO, Meng-Yu
NO. 6, LN. 546, SEC. 6, ZHANGLU RD., FUXING
TOWNSHIP
CHANGHUA COUNTY / TW
04 / CHEN, Yu-Ta
NO. 6, LN. 546, SEC. 6, ZHANGLU RD., FUXING
TOWNSHIP
CHANGHUA COUNTY / TW
05 / KO, Ming-Lung
NO. 6, LN. 546, SEC. 6, ZHANGLU RD., FUXING
TOWNSHIP
CHANGHUA COUNTY / TW
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Becker Kurig Straus
Patentanwälte
Bavariastrasse 7
80336 München / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17204281.429.11.2017
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateTW2017013598819.10.2017         Original published format: TW 106135988
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473499
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.04.2018
ClassificationInternational:B60R19/48
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:MONTAGEMECHANISMUS FÜR FAHRZEUGSENSOR[2019/17]
English:MOUNTING MECHANISM FOR VEHICLE SENSOR[2019/17]
French:MÉCANISME DE MONTAGE POUR CAPTEUR DE VÉHICULE[2019/17]
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
07.12.2017Examination requested  [2019/17]
Documents cited:Search[XI]CN201211874Y  (WETRON ELECTRONIC TECHNOLOGY S [CN]) [X] 1-3,6 * figure - * [I] 4,5,7-9;
 [X]JP2013221880  (DENSO CORP) [X] 1-3,6 * figure - *;
 [X]JP2012242353  (DENSO CORP) [X] 1,2,6 * figure - *;
 [X]EP2937250  (MAC LEAN FOGG CO [US]) [X] 1,3 * figure - *;
 [X]JP2016008923  (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1,6 * figure - *;
 [X]WO2016009625  (DENSO CORP [JP]) [X] 1 * figure - *;
 [X]WO2016002117  (DENSO CORP [JP]) [X] 1 * figure - *;
 [X]FR2986483  (RENAULT SA [FR]) [X] 1 * figure - *;
 [X]EP1083099  (PORSCHE AG [DE]) [X] 1 * figure - *