blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3492243

EP3492243 - APPARATUS FOR ADDITIVELY MANUFACTURING THREE-DIMENSIONAL OBJECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.09.2022
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  01.12.2021
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  19.02.2021
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  13.12.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  03.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.09.2022Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.10.2022  [2022/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CL Schutzrechtsverwaltungs GmbH
An der Zeil 2
96215 Lichtenfels / DE
[2019/23]
Inventor(s)01 / Hofmann, Alexander
Geutenreuth 42
96260 Weismain / DE
 [2019/23]
Representative(s)Hafner & Kohl PartmbB
Schleiermacherstraße 25
90491 Nürnberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2019/23]Hafner & Kohl
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Schleiermacherstraße 25
90491 Nürnberg / DE
Application number, filing date17204528.829.11.2017
[2019/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3492243
Date:05.06.2019
Language:EN
[2019/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.05.2018
ClassificationIPC:B29C64/35, B29C64/20, B33Y40/00, B33Y30/00, B22F10/20, B22F10/70, // B29C64/153, B29C64/165
[2021/49]
CPC:
B29C64/20 (EP,US); B22F10/28 (EP,US); B22F10/73 (EP,US);
B29C64/153 (EP,US); B29C64/35 (EP,US); B33Y10/00 (US);
B33Y30/00 (EP,US); B33Y40/00 (EP,US); B29C64/141 (US);
B29C64/165 (EP,US); Y02P10/25 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2019/23]B29C64/35, B33Y40/00, B33Y30/00, B29C64/20, B22F3/105
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/03]
Former [2019/23]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR GENERATIVEN FERTIGUNG DREIDIMENSIONALER OBJEKTE[2019/23]
English:APPARATUS FOR ADDITIVELY MANUFACTURING THREE-DIMENSIONAL OBJECTS[2019/23]
French:APPAREIL DE FABRICATION ADDITIVE D'OBJETS TRIDIMENSIONNELS[2019/23]
Examination procedure05.12.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.12.2019Examination requested  [2020/03]
05.12.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
18.02.2021Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.08.2021Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.12.2021Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.04.2022Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2022/40]
09.05.2022Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2022/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
19.11.2020Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.202105   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US6861613  (MEINERS WILHELM [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,5,13,14 * column 4, line 33 - line 40 * * column 6, line 45 - line 48 * * claims 1,2,9 * * figure - *;
 [A]WO2006033621  (EDVINSSON JERRY [SE]) [A] 1-14 * page 7, line 31 - page 8, line 11 ** figures 2,3 *;
 [XY]EP2902137  (PANASONIC IP MAN CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,5,8-11,13,14 * paragraphs [0029] , [0030] * * paragraphs [0033] , [0034] * * figures 7,8 * [Y] 6,7;
 [Y]US2016136731  (MCMURTRY DAVID ROBERTS [GB], et al) [Y] 6,7 * paragraphs [0073] - [0075] * * paragraph [0086] * * figure - * * claim - *;
 [XI]WO2017153463  (DIGITAL METAL AB [SE]) [X] 1-3,5,8,12-14 * page 5, line 25 - line 35 * * page 12, line 1 - line 14 * * page 12, line 26 - line 35 * * page 22, line 1 - line 4 * * figure 4 * [I] 4
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.