Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3348758

EP3348758 - BALL CATCH [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  21.09.2018
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.01.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Otto Ganter GmbH & Co. KG Normteilefabrik
Triberger Strasse 3
78120 Furtwangen / DE
[2018/29]
Inventor(s)01 / Pychtin, Alexander
Sandreuteweg 17
78112 St. Georgen / DE
 [2018/29]
Representative(s)Riebling, Peter
Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60
88113 Lindau / DE
[2018/29]
Application number, filing date17207923.818.12.2017
[2018/29]
Priority number, dateDE201720100157U13.01.2017         Original published format: DE 202017100157 U
[2018/29]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3348758
Date:18.07.2018
Language:DE
[2018/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.06.2018
ClassificationInternational:E05C19/04, E05D5/02, // F16B2/16
[2018/29]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/43]
Former [2018/29]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:KUGELSCHNÄPPER[2018/29]
English:BALL CATCH[2018/29]
French:LOQUETEAUX À BILLES[2018/29]
Examination procedure18.12.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
17.09.2018Examination requested  [2018/43]
11.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Documents cited:Search[XI]JPH0418179U  (N.N.) [X] 1-5,9 * the whole document * [I] 6-8,10;
 [X]US4121319  (WELCH ANTHONY HAROLD ERNEST) [X] 1,4 * column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 58; figures 1-3 *;
 [X]GB2158864  (T R W UNITED CARR LIMITED) [X] 1,10 * page 1, line 114 - page 2, line 121; figures 1-6 *;
 [A]DE102004030124  (CURAMIK ELECTRONICS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-3,5 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0035]; figures 7, 9 *;
 [A]US2014361553  (SALE JR KENNETH MARTIN [US]) [A] 1-3,5,7 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0036]; figures 1-3 *