Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3332668

EP3332668 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING BRUSH FIELDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.11.2019
Database last updated on 17.02.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  27.06.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  07.12.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  11.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.11.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 04.12.2019  [2019/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ranir GmbH
Auf dem Seidenberg 1
53721 Siegburg / DE
[2018/24]
Inventor(s)01 / * * *
 [2018/24]
Representative(s)Reiser & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Weinheimer Straße 102
69469 Weinheim / DE
[2018/24]
Application number, filing date17209033.408.12.2014
[2018/24]
Priority number, dateDE20131011470420.12.2013         Original published format: DE102013114704
[2018/24]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3332668
Date:13.06.2018
Language:DE
[2018/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3332668
Date:04.12.2019
Language:DE
[2019/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.05.2018
ClassificationInternational:A46D3/04
[2018/24]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/02]
Former [2018/24]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN VON BORSTENFELDERN[2018/24]
English:DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING BRUSH FIELDS[2018/24]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE COMPARTIMENTS DE SOIES[2018/24]
Examination procedure30.11.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/02]
30.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
28.06.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.10.2019Fee for grant paid
22.10.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.10.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP14196747.1  / EP2886010
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
20.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
21.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XI]DE102010055686  (ZAHORANSKY AG [DE]) [X] 1,11 * paragraphs [0049] , [0053] * * figures 1,2,4; claims 1,2 * [I] 2-10,12-15;
 [A]EP2196107  (FRISETTA KUNSTSTOFF GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,12 * figure - *;
 [X]EP2408334  (ZAHORANSKY AG [DE]) [X] 1,11 * figures 1,7-29 *;
 [X]EP2557961  (ZAHORANSKY AG [DE]) [X] 1,11 * paragraphs [0009] , [0030]; figure 18 *;
 [X]DE3405001  (SCHLESINGER GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1,11 * figure - *;
 [X]DE3920769  (RUEB FRITZ [DE]) [X] 1,11 * column 3, line 37; figures 1,14 *;
 [A]EP0193074  (SCHLERF CORONET WERKE [DE]) [A] 1,11 * figure - *