blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3503339

EP3503339 - SUPPORT UNIT FOR A PAYMENT TERMINAL AND COVER FOR SUCH SUPPORT UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.07.2020
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  24.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.07.2020Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.08.2020  [2020/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ergonomic Solutions International Limited
Unit B1 Longmead Business Centre
Blenheim Road
Epsom
Surrey KT19 9QQ / GB
[2019/26]
Inventor(s)01 / BURMESTER, Benny
c/o Ergonomic Solutions
Stenholm 19
9400 Nørresundby / DK
 [2019/26]
Representative(s)Tellefsen, Jens J., et al
Patrade A/S
Ceresbyen 75
8000 Aarhus C / DK
[2019/26]
Application number, filing date17209530.921.12.2017
[2019/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3503339
Date:26.06.2019
Language:EN
[2019/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.05.2018
ClassificationIPC:H02J7/00
[2019/26]
CPC:
H02J7/0044 (EP,US); H02J7/0013 (EP,US); H04M1/04 (EP);
G07F7/0873 (EP); H02J2310/22 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/26]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:TRAGEEINHEIT FÜR EIN ZAHLUNGSENDGERÄT UND ABDECKUNG FÜR SOLCH EINE STÜTZEINHEIT[2019/26]
English:SUPPORT UNIT FOR A PAYMENT TERMINAL AND COVER FOR SUCH SUPPORT UNIT[2019/26]
French:UNITÉ DE SUPPORT DESTINÉE À UN TERMINAL DE PAIEMENT ET COUVERCLE POUR UNE TELLE UNITÉ DE SUPPORT[2019/26]
Examination procedure03.01.2020Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2020/32]
28.01.2020Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2020/32]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201903   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP2239825  (ABB AG [DE]) [A] 1-12 * abstract *;
 [XI]EP2278669  (LOW MR ENG CHOON [CN]) [X] 1,10,12 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0041]; figures 1-4 * [I] 2-9,11;
 [A]US2013170682  (CONRAD DEREK [US], et al) [A] 1-12* abstract *;
 [XI]US2016141815  (WARREN WILLIAM J [US]) [X] 1,10,12 * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0089]; figures 1-17 * [I] 2-9,11
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.