blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3376712

EP3376712 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR IMPLEMENTING COMMUNICATION BETWEEN VIRTUAL MACHINES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.09.2020
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  11.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.05.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  17.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2022Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 17.08.2022  [2022/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[2018/38]
Inventor(s)01 / WU, Tianyi
Huawei Technologies Co.,Ltd., Intellectual
Property Department
G1-2F, Bantian, Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong / CN
 [2019/46]
Former [2018/38]01 / WU, Tianyi
Huawei Technologies Co.,Ltd., Intellectual
Property Department
G1-2F, Bantian, Longgang District
shenzhen, Guangdong / CN
Representative(s)Kreuz, Georg Maria
Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH
Riesstraße 25
80992 München / DE
[2018/38]
Application number, filing date17210616.316.06.2014
[2018/38]
Priority number, dateWO2013CN9120231.12.2013         Original published format: PCT/CN2013/091202
[2018/38]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3376712
Date:19.09.2018
Language:EN
[2018/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3376712
Date:13.11.2019
Language:EN
[2019/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.06.2018
ClassificationIPC:H04L12/24, H04L12/701, H04L12/713, H04L12/741
[2019/22]
CPC:
H04L41/122 (EP); H04L61/103 (CN,US); H04L61/2592 (US);
G06F13/4004 (EP,US); G06F9/455 (US); G06F9/45558 (EP,US);
H04L12/4633 (CN,US); H04L12/4641 (CN,US); H04L41/12 (US);
H04L45/56 (US); H04L45/586 (EP,US); H04L45/74 (CN,US);
H04L45/745 (EP,CN,US); H04L49/25 (CN,US); H04L49/354 (CN,US);
H04L61/2557 (US); G06F2009/45595 (EP,US); H04L2101/622 (US) (-)
Former IPC [2018/38]H04L12/24, H04L12/701
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
Former [2018/38]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR IMPLEMENTIERUNG DER KOMMUNIKATION ZWISCHEN VIRTUELLEN MASCHINEN[2018/38]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR IMPLEMENTING COMMUNICATION BETWEEN VIRTUAL MACHINES[2018/38]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR METTRE EN UVRE UNE COMMUNICATION ENTRE DES MACHINES VIRTUELLES[2018/38]
Examination procedure31.10.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.03.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
19.03.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
23.05.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.10.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
02.10.2019Fee for grant paid
02.10.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP14877226.2  / EP3091696
Opposition(s)14.08.2020No opposition filed within time limit [2020/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
30.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
02.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
01.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU16.06.2014
AL13.11.2019
AT13.11.2019
CY13.11.2019
CZ13.11.2019
DK13.11.2019
EE13.11.2019
ES13.11.2019
FI13.11.2019
HR13.11.2019
IT13.11.2019
LT13.11.2019
LV13.11.2019
MC13.11.2019
MK13.11.2019
MT13.11.2019
NL13.11.2019
PL13.11.2019
RO13.11.2019
RS13.11.2019
SE13.11.2019
SI13.11.2019
SK13.11.2019
SM13.11.2019
TR13.11.2019
BG13.02.2020
NO13.02.2020
GR14.02.2020
IS13.03.2020
PT13.03.2020
IE16.06.2020
LU16.06.2020
BE30.06.2020
CH30.06.2020
LI30.06.2020
[2022/33]
Former [2022/27]HU16.06.2014
AL13.11.2019
AT13.11.2019
CY13.11.2019
CZ13.11.2019
DK13.11.2019
EE13.11.2019
ES13.11.2019
FI13.11.2019
HR13.11.2019
IT13.11.2019
LT13.11.2019
LV13.11.2019
MC13.11.2019
MT13.11.2019
NL13.11.2019
PL13.11.2019
RO13.11.2019
RS13.11.2019
SE13.11.2019
SI13.11.2019
SK13.11.2019
SM13.11.2019
TR13.11.2019
BG13.02.2020
NO13.02.2020
GR14.02.2020
IS13.03.2020
PT13.03.2020
IE16.06.2020
LU16.06.2020
BE30.06.2020
CH30.06.2020
LI30.06.2020
Former [2021/24]AL13.11.2019
AT13.11.2019
CZ13.11.2019
DK13.11.2019
EE13.11.2019
ES13.11.2019
FI13.11.2019
HR13.11.2019
IT13.11.2019
LT13.11.2019
LV13.11.2019
MC13.11.2019
NL13.11.2019
PL13.11.2019
RO13.11.2019
RS13.11.2019
SE13.11.2019
SI13.11.2019
SK13.11.2019
SM13.11.2019
BG13.02.2020
NO13.02.2020
GR14.02.2020
IS13.03.2020
PT13.03.2020
IE16.06.2020
LU16.06.2020
BE30.06.2020
CH30.06.2020
LI30.06.2020
Former [2021/20]AL13.11.2019
AT13.11.2019
CZ13.11.2019
DK13.11.2019
EE13.11.2019
ES13.11.2019
FI13.11.2019
HR13.11.2019
IT13.11.2019
LT13.11.2019
LV13.11.2019
MC13.11.2019
NL13.11.2019
PL13.11.2019
RO13.11.2019
RS13.11.2019
SE13.11.2019
SI13.11.2019
SK13.11.2019
SM13.11.2019
BG13.02.2020
NO13.02.2020
GR14.02.2020
IS13.03.2020
PT13.03.2020
IE16.06.2020
LU16.06.2020
CH30.06.2020
LI30.06.2020
Former [2021/15]AL13.11.2019
AT13.11.2019
CZ13.11.2019
DK13.11.2019
EE13.11.2019
ES13.11.2019
FI13.11.2019
HR13.11.2019
IT13.11.2019
LT13.11.2019
LV13.11.2019
MC13.11.2019
NL13.11.2019
PL13.11.2019
RO13.11.2019
RS13.11.2019
SE13.11.2019
SI13.11.2019
SK13.11.2019
SM13.11.2019
BG13.02.2020
NO13.02.2020
GR14.02.2020
IS13.03.2020
PT13.03.2020
LU16.06.2020
Former [2021/10]AL13.11.2019
AT13.11.2019
CZ13.11.2019
DK13.11.2019
EE13.11.2019
ES13.11.2019
FI13.11.2019
HR13.11.2019
IT13.11.2019
LT13.11.2019
LV13.11.2019
MC13.11.2019
NL13.11.2019
PL13.11.2019
RO13.11.2019
RS13.11.2019
SE13.11.2019
SI13.11.2019
SK13.11.2019
SM13.11.2019
BG13.02.2020
NO13.02.2020
GR14.02.2020
IS13.03.2020
PT13.03.2020
Former [2020/51]AL13.11.2019
AT13.11.2019
CZ13.11.2019
DK13.11.2019
EE13.11.2019
ES13.11.2019
FI13.11.2019
HR13.11.2019
LT13.11.2019
LV13.11.2019
NL13.11.2019
PL13.11.2019
RO13.11.2019
RS13.11.2019
SE13.11.2019
SI13.11.2019
SK13.11.2019
SM13.11.2019
BG13.02.2020
NO13.02.2020
GR14.02.2020
IS13.03.2020
PT13.03.2020
Former [2020/37]AL13.11.2019
CZ13.11.2019
DK13.11.2019
EE13.11.2019
ES13.11.2019
FI13.11.2019
HR13.11.2019
LT13.11.2019
LV13.11.2019
NL13.11.2019
PL13.11.2019
RO13.11.2019
RS13.11.2019
SE13.11.2019
SK13.11.2019
SM13.11.2019
BG13.02.2020
NO13.02.2020
GR14.02.2020
IS13.03.2020
PT13.03.2020
Former [2020/36]AL13.11.2019
CZ13.11.2019
DK13.11.2019
EE13.11.2019
ES13.11.2019
FI13.11.2019
HR13.11.2019
LT13.11.2019
LV13.11.2019
NL13.11.2019
PL13.11.2019
RO13.11.2019
RS13.11.2019
SE13.11.2019
BG13.02.2020
NO13.02.2020
GR14.02.2020
IS13.03.2020
PT13.03.2020
Former [2020/35]AL13.11.2019
CZ13.11.2019
ES13.11.2019
FI13.11.2019
HR13.11.2019
LT13.11.2019
LV13.11.2019
NL13.11.2019
PL13.11.2019
RO13.11.2019
RS13.11.2019
SE13.11.2019
BG13.02.2020
NO13.02.2020
GR14.02.2020
IS13.03.2020
PT13.03.2020
Former [2020/34]AL13.11.2019
ES13.11.2019
FI13.11.2019
HR13.11.2019
LT13.11.2019
LV13.11.2019
NL13.11.2019
PL13.11.2019
RS13.11.2019
SE13.11.2019
BG13.02.2020
NO13.02.2020
GR14.02.2020
IS13.03.2020
PT13.03.2020
Former [2020/32]AL13.11.2019
FI13.11.2019
HR13.11.2019
LT13.11.2019
LV13.11.2019
NL13.11.2019
PL13.11.2019
RS13.11.2019
SE13.11.2019
BG13.02.2020
NO13.02.2020
GR14.02.2020
IS13.03.2020
PT13.03.2020
Former [2020/25]FI13.11.2019
HR13.11.2019
LT13.11.2019
LV13.11.2019
NL13.11.2019
PL13.11.2019
RS13.11.2019
SE13.11.2019
BG13.02.2020
NO13.02.2020
GR14.02.2020
IS13.03.2020
PT13.03.2020
Former [2020/24]FI13.11.2019
LT13.11.2019
LV13.11.2019
NL13.11.2019
PL13.11.2019
SE13.11.2019
BG13.02.2020
NO13.02.2020
GR14.02.2020
IS13.03.2020
PT13.03.2020
Former [2020/23]FI13.11.2019
LT13.11.2019
LV13.11.2019
NL13.11.2019
PL13.11.2019
SE13.11.2019
BG13.02.2020
NO13.02.2020
GR14.02.2020
PT13.03.2020
Former [2020/22]FI13.11.2019
LT13.11.2019
SE13.11.2019
BG13.02.2020
NO13.02.2020
PT13.03.2020
Former [2020/21]NO13.02.2020
Documents cited:Search[A]US2011019676  (PORTOLANI MAURIZIO [CH], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 1, paragraph 20 - page 2, paragraph 36 * * page 3, paragraph 50 - page 4, paragraph 56 ** figures 1, 3 *;
 [A]US2012099602  (NAGAPUDI VENKATESH [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 2, paragraph 41 - page 3, paragraph 51 * * figures 1B, 2 *;
 [YA]EP2618535  (ZTE CORP [CN]) [Y] 8-13,15 * page 5, paragraph 30 - page 7, paragraph 64 * * figures 1, 2 * [A] 1-7,14;
 [YA]US2013266015  (QU XIAORONG [US], et al) [Y] 1-7,14 * page 2, paragraph 24 - page 3, paragraph 27 * * page 4, paragraph 31 - page 4, paragraph 34 * * figures 1-3, 6-9 * [A] 8-13,15;
 [Y]US2013318219  (KANCHERLA MANI PRASAD [US]) [Y] 1-15 * page 3, paragraph 47 - page 4, paragraph 57 * * page 7, paragraph 74 - page 7, paragraph 76 * * figures 1A-2, 5B *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.