Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3192624

EP3192624 - POWER TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.10.2018
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  05.07.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  24.11.2017
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  16.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2018(Expected) grantpublished on 07.11.2018  [2018/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Power Box AG
Poststrasse 6
6301 Zug / CH
[2017/29]
Inventor(s)01 / FIRTH, Robert
Kilnfield House
45 Common Road
Dunnington
York, Yorkshire YO19 5PA / GB
02 / LINTON, Andrew
Kilnfield House
45 Common Road
Dunnington
York, Yorkshire YO19 5PA / GB
 [2017/29]
Representative(s)Wood, Graham
Bailey Walsh & Co LLP
1 York Place
Leeds, LS1 2DR / GB
[2017/29]
Application number, filing date17275009.318.01.2017
[2017/29]
Priority number, dateGB2016000088518.01.2016         Original published format: GB 201600885
[2017/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3192624
Date:19.07.2017
Language:EN
[2017/29]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP3192624
Date:11.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3192624
Date:07.11.2018
Language:EN
[2018/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.09.2017
ClassificationInternational:B27C5/10, B23Q1/48, B23Q9/00
[2017/29]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/29]
TitleGerman:HANDWERKZEUGMASCHINE[2017/29]
English:POWER TOOL[2017/29]
French:OUTIL MOTORISÉ[2017/29]
Examination procedure18.01.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
16.11.2017Examination requested  [2017/52]
29.01.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.07.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.09.2018Fee for grant paid
20.09.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.09.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP1366873  (FESTOOL GMBH [DE]) [Y] 10 * figure -; claims 1-8 *
 [XY]  - WeAreTwoDoorsDown, "Features of the Triton TRA-001/TRC-001 Router", Youtube, (20140129), URL: https://www.youtube.com/watch?v=rRykNbGE5zs, (20170321), XP054977228 [X] 1-3,11 * 5'55'' to 6'55''; 8'00'' to 9'00''; 9'18'' to 10'40'' * [Y] 10
 [A]  - Darrell Morris, "Triton Dual Mode Precision Plunge Router TRA001", (20120321), pages 1 - 62, URL: http://go.rockler.com/tech/48271TritonRouterInstructions.pdf, (20170321), XP055356831 [A] 1,11 * EXTENDED BASEPLATE AND FENCE; page 8, column R *
by applicantGB2517640