Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471271

EP3471271 - IMPROVED CONVOLUTIONS OF DIGITAL SIGNALS USING A BIT REQUIREMENT OPTIMIZATION OF A TARGET DIGITAL SIGNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.02.2020
Database last updated on 25.02.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.02.2020Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.03.2020 [2020/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ACOUSTICAL BEAUTY
Loirecopark I Route d' Aubigné Racan
72500 VAAS / FR
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / MILOT, Gilles
4 rue Ernest Lavisse
75012 PARIS / FR
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Bell, Mark , et al
Marks & Clerk France
Immeuble «Visium»
22, avenue Aristide Briand
94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17306401.516.10.2017
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471271
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.05.2018
ClassificationInternational:H03M7/30, H03M1/70
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERBESSERTE KONVOLUTIONEN VON DIGITALEN SIGNALEN MIT VERWENDUNG EINER BITANFORDERUNGSOPTIMIERUNG EINES DIGITALEN ZIELSIGNALS[2019/16]
English:IMPROVED CONVOLUTIONS OF DIGITAL SIGNALS USING A BIT REQUIREMENT OPTIMIZATION OF A TARGET DIGITAL SIGNAL[2019/16]
French:CONVOLUTIONS AMÉLIORÉES DE SIGNAUX NUMÉRIQUES UTILISANT UNE OPTIMISATION DES EXIGENCES DE BITS D'UN SIGNAL NUMÉRIQUE CIBLE[2019/16]
Examination procedure18.10.2019Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2020/12]
31.10.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2020/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XI]US6505221  (MASCHMANN MARTIN [DE]) [X] 1,23-25 * columns 4-5; figure 1 * [I] 2-22;
 [XI]US4229800  (GREGORIAN ROUBIK ET AL) [X] 1,23-25 * columns 2-4; figure 1 * [I] 2-22;
 [A]US9559717  (BURGIO CARMELO [IT]) [A] 1-25 * figure 1 *
 [A]  - SANTORO M R ET AL, "Rounding algorithms for IEEE multipliers", COMPUTER ARITHMETIC, 1989., PROCEEDINGS OF 9TH SYMPOSIUM ON SANTA MONICA, CA, USA 6-8 SEPT. 1, WASHINGTON, DC, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC. PR, US, (19890906), doi:10.1109/ARITH.1989.72824, ISBN 978-0-8186-8963-5, pages 176 - 183, XP010033240 [A] 1-25 * figures 1-6; tables 1-3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ARITH.1989.72824