EP3471271 - IMPROVED CONVOLUTIONS OF DIGITAL SIGNALS USING A BIT REQUIREMENT OPTIMIZATION OF A TARGET DIGITAL SIGNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.02.2020 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ACOUSTICAL BEAUTY Loirecopark I Route d' Aubigné Racan 72500 VAAS / FR | [2019/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MILOT, Gilles 4 rue Ernest Lavisse 75012 PARIS / FR | [2019/16] | Representative(s) | Bell, Mark, et al Marks & Clerk France Immeuble «Visium» 22, avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [2019/16] | Application number, filing date | 17306401.5 | 16.10.2017 | [2019/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3471271 | Date: | 17.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H03M7/30, H03M1/70 | [2019/16] | CPC: |
H03M1/70 (EP,US);
H03M7/3073 (EP,US);
G06F17/15 (EP,US);
G06F7/49942 (US);
H03M7/3059 (EP,US);
H03M7/6047 (US);
G10L19/24 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE KONVOLUTIONEN VON DIGITALEN SIGNALEN MIT VERWENDUNG EINER BITANFORDERUNGSOPTIMIERUNG EINES DIGITALEN ZIELSIGNALS | [2019/16] | English: | IMPROVED CONVOLUTIONS OF DIGITAL SIGNALS USING A BIT REQUIREMENT OPTIMIZATION OF A TARGET DIGITAL SIGNAL | [2019/16] | French: | CONVOLUTIONS AMÉLIORÉES DE SIGNAUX NUMÉRIQUES UTILISANT UNE OPTIMISATION DES EXIGENCES DE BITS D'UN SIGNAL NUMÉRIQUE CIBLE | [2019/16] | Examination procedure | 18.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/12] | 31.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US4229800 (GREGORIAN ROUBIK, et al) [X] 1,23-25 * columns 2-4; figure 1 * [I] 2-22; | [XI]US6505221 (MASCHMANN MARTIN [DE]) [X] 1,23-25 * columns 4-5; figure 1 * [I] 2-22; | [A]US9559717 (BURGIO CARMELO [IT]) [A] 1-25* figure 1 *; | [A] - SANTORO M R ET AL, "Rounding algorithms for IEEE multipliers", COMPUTER ARITHMETIC, 1989., PROCEEDINGS OF 9TH SYMPOSIUM ON SANTA MONICA, CA, USA 6-8 SEPT. 1, WASHINGTON, DC, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC. PR, US, (19890906), doi:10.1109/ARITH.1989.72824, ISBN 978-0-8186-8963-5, pages 176 - 183, XP010033240 [A] 1-25 * figures 1-6; tables 1-3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ARITH.1989.72824 |