Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3474637


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
28.10.2019 Amendment by applicant
25.10.2019 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
25.10.2019 Request for examination filed published on  27.11.2019  [2019/48]
25.10.2019 Change - designated states published on  27.11.2019  [2019/48]
01.10.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.03.2019 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  24.04.2019  [2019/17]
30.10.2017 Change - representative