Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3474637

EP3474637 - AUTOMATIC RELOADING AND TRANSPORT SYSTEM FOR SOLID TARGETS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  25.10.2019
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.10.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Soletanche Freyssinet
280 avenue Napoléon Bonaparte
92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / VLASAK, Frantisek
Modrinova 1094
TREBIC 67401 / CZ
02 / JELINEK, Pavel
Modrinova 1094
TREBIC 67401 / CZ
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Plasseraud IP
66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2019/17]Cabinet Plasseraud
66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date17306451.020.10.2017
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3474637
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.05.2018
ClassificationInternational:H05H6/00, G21F7/06, G21G1/10, G21K5/08, G21K5/10
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/48]
Former [2019/17]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:AUTOMATISCHES NEULADE- UND TRANSPORTSYSTEM FÜR FESTE ZIELE[2019/17]
English:AUTOMATIC RELOADING AND TRANSPORT SYSTEM FOR SOLID TARGETS[2019/17]
French:SYSTÈME DE RECHARGEMENT ET DE TRANSPORT AUTOMATIQUE POUR CIBLES SOLIDES[2019/17]
Examination procedure22.10.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.10.2019Examination requested  [2019/48]
22.10.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9707122  (UNIV WASHINGTON [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 4, line 4 - page 5, line 3 * * page 20, line 23 - page 22, line 20 * * page 27, line 15 - page 28, line 33 * * page 29, lines 29-33 * * page 30, line 5 - page 32, line 24; figure 4 * * page 33, lines 7-11 *;
 [A]JP2011153827  (NATL INST RADIOLOGICAL SCIENCE) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0013] - [0015] *;
 [A]US3549492  (RICCI ENZO, et al) [A] 1-10 * column 3, lines 1-74 * * column 1, lines 60-66 *;
 [A]WO2014186898  (CANADIAN LIGHT SOURCE INC [CA]) [A] 1-15 * page 6, lines 20-32 * * page 12, line 19 - page 13, line 29; figures 19,23 *;
 [A]US2005286675  (KANG YOUNG-HWAN [KR], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0002] , [0009] , [0059] , [0060]; figure 10 *