blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3499518

EP3499518 - ELECTRIC CONDUCTOR MADE OF SOLID SEGMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.10.2022
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.11.2021
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  28.06.2021
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  03.12.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  17.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.04.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nexans
4, Allée de l'Arche
92400 Courbevoie / FR
[2019/25]
Inventor(s)01 / MENGER, Michael
Hirsekamp 11
38110 Braunschweig / DE
02 / VOIGT, Torsten
Berenbosteler Strasse 10a
30827 Garbsen / DE
03 / GAULER, Volker
Ernst-Lindmüller Strasse 9
30900 Wedemark / DE
 [2019/25]
Representative(s)Ipsilon
Le Centralis
63, avenue du Général Leclerc
92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR
[2021/49]
Former [2019/25]Lenne, Laurence
Ipsilon
Le Centralis
63, avenue du Général Leclerc
92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR
Application number, filing date17306768.713.12.2017
[2019/25]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3499518
Date:19.06.2019
Language:DE
[2019/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3499518
Date:08.12.2021
Language:DE
[2021/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.05.2018
ClassificationIPC:H01B9/00, H01B7/282, // H01B7/288, H01B13/02
[2021/28]
CPC:
H01B7/2825 (EP,US); H01B5/00 (KR); H01B5/08 (CN);
H01B5/10 (CN); H01B5/101 (CN); H01B7/10 (US);
H01B7/288 (EP,CN,US); H01B7/40 (US); H01B9/006 (EP,CN,US);
H01B13/02 (EP,US); Y02A30/14 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2019/25]H01B9/00, // H01B7/288, H01B13/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/25]
TitleGerman:ELEKTRISCHER LEITER AUS MASSIVEN SEGMENTEN[2019/25]
English:ELECTRIC CONDUCTOR MADE OF SOLID SEGMENTS[2019/25]
French:CONDUCTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE COMPOSÉ DE SEGMENTS SOLIDES[2019/25]
Examination procedure03.07.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.07.2018Examination requested  [2019/25]
03.07.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
02.12.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.02.2021Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.06.2021Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.10.2021Fee for grant paid
27.10.2021Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.10.2021Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)09.09.2022No opposition filed within time limit [2022/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
24.12.2020Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU13.12.2017
AL08.12.2021
CY08.12.2021
CZ08.12.2021
DK08.12.2021
EE08.12.2021
ES08.12.2021
FI08.12.2021
HR08.12.2021
LT08.12.2021
LV08.12.2021
MC08.12.2021
MK08.12.2021
NL08.12.2021
PL08.12.2021
RO08.12.2021
RS08.12.2021
SE08.12.2021
SI08.12.2021
SK08.12.2021
SM08.12.2021
IE13.12.2021
LU13.12.2021
BE31.12.2021
CH31.12.2021
LI31.12.2021
BG08.03.2022
GR09.03.2022
IS08.04.2022
PT08.04.2022
[2024/22]
Former [2023/33]HU13.12.2017
AL08.12.2021
CY08.12.2021
CZ08.12.2021
DK08.12.2021
EE08.12.2021
ES08.12.2021
FI08.12.2021
HR08.12.2021
LT08.12.2021
LV08.12.2021
MC08.12.2021
NL08.12.2021
PL08.12.2021
RO08.12.2021
RS08.12.2021
SE08.12.2021
SI08.12.2021
SK08.12.2021
SM08.12.2021
IE13.12.2021
LU13.12.2021
BE31.12.2021
CH31.12.2021
LI31.12.2021
BG08.03.2022
GR09.03.2022
IS08.04.2022
PT08.04.2022
Former [2023/30]AL08.12.2021
CY08.12.2021
CZ08.12.2021
DK08.12.2021
EE08.12.2021
ES08.12.2021
FI08.12.2021
HR08.12.2021
LT08.12.2021
LV08.12.2021
MC08.12.2021
NL08.12.2021
PL08.12.2021
RO08.12.2021
RS08.12.2021
SE08.12.2021
SI08.12.2021
SK08.12.2021
SM08.12.2021
IE13.12.2021
LU13.12.2021
BE31.12.2021
CH31.12.2021
LI31.12.2021
BG08.03.2022
GR09.03.2022
IS08.04.2022
PT08.04.2022
Former [2023/03]AL08.12.2021
CZ08.12.2021
DK08.12.2021
EE08.12.2021
ES08.12.2021
FI08.12.2021
HR08.12.2021
LT08.12.2021
LV08.12.2021
MC08.12.2021
NL08.12.2021
PL08.12.2021
RO08.12.2021
RS08.12.2021
SE08.12.2021
SI08.12.2021
SK08.12.2021
SM08.12.2021
IE13.12.2021
LU13.12.2021
BE31.12.2021
CH31.12.2021
LI31.12.2021
BG08.03.2022
GR09.03.2022
IS08.04.2022
PT08.04.2022
Former [2023/01]AL08.12.2021
CZ08.12.2021
DK08.12.2021
EE08.12.2021
ES08.12.2021
FI08.12.2021
HR08.12.2021
LT08.12.2021
LV08.12.2021
MC08.12.2021
NL08.12.2021
PL08.12.2021
RO08.12.2021
RS08.12.2021
SE08.12.2021
SI08.12.2021
SK08.12.2021
SM08.12.2021
IE13.12.2021
LU13.12.2021
BE31.12.2021
BG08.03.2022
GR09.03.2022
IS08.04.2022
PT08.04.2022
Former [2022/49]AL08.12.2021
CZ08.12.2021
DK08.12.2021
EE08.12.2021
ES08.12.2021
FI08.12.2021
HR08.12.2021
LT08.12.2021
LV08.12.2021
MC08.12.2021
NL08.12.2021
PL08.12.2021
RO08.12.2021
RS08.12.2021
SE08.12.2021
SK08.12.2021
SM08.12.2021
IE13.12.2021
LU13.12.2021
BG08.03.2022
GR09.03.2022
IS08.04.2022
PT08.04.2022
Former [2022/48]CZ08.12.2021
DK08.12.2021
EE08.12.2021
ES08.12.2021
FI08.12.2021
HR08.12.2021
LT08.12.2021
LV08.12.2021
MC08.12.2021
NL08.12.2021
PL08.12.2021
RO08.12.2021
RS08.12.2021
SE08.12.2021
SK08.12.2021
SM08.12.2021
IE13.12.2021
LU13.12.2021
BG08.03.2022
GR09.03.2022
IS08.04.2022
PT08.04.2022
Former [2022/46]CZ08.12.2021
DK08.12.2021
EE08.12.2021
ES08.12.2021
FI08.12.2021
HR08.12.2021
LT08.12.2021
LV08.12.2021
MC08.12.2021
NL08.12.2021
PL08.12.2021
RO08.12.2021
RS08.12.2021
SE08.12.2021
SK08.12.2021
SM08.12.2021
LU13.12.2021
BG08.03.2022
GR09.03.2022
IS08.04.2022
PT08.04.2022
Former [2022/44]CZ08.12.2021
EE08.12.2021
ES08.12.2021
FI08.12.2021
HR08.12.2021
LT08.12.2021
LV08.12.2021
MC08.12.2021
NL08.12.2021
PL08.12.2021
RO08.12.2021
RS08.12.2021
SE08.12.2021
SK08.12.2021
SM08.12.2021
BG08.03.2022
GR09.03.2022
IS08.04.2022
PT08.04.2022
Former [2022/42]CZ08.12.2021
EE08.12.2021
ES08.12.2021
FI08.12.2021
HR08.12.2021
LT08.12.2021
LV08.12.2021
NL08.12.2021
PL08.12.2021
RO08.12.2021
RS08.12.2021
SE08.12.2021
SK08.12.2021
SM08.12.2021
BG08.03.2022
GR09.03.2022
IS08.04.2022
PT08.04.2022
Former [2022/36]CZ08.12.2021
EE08.12.2021
ES08.12.2021
FI08.12.2021
HR08.12.2021
LT08.12.2021
LV08.12.2021
NL08.12.2021
PL08.12.2021
RO08.12.2021
RS08.12.2021
SE08.12.2021
SK08.12.2021
SM08.12.2021
BG08.03.2022
GR09.03.2022
PT08.04.2022
Former [2022/35]CZ08.12.2021
EE08.12.2021
ES08.12.2021
FI08.12.2021
HR08.12.2021
LT08.12.2021
LV08.12.2021
NL08.12.2021
RO08.12.2021
RS08.12.2021
SE08.12.2021
SK08.12.2021
SM08.12.2021
BG08.03.2022
GR09.03.2022
PT08.04.2022
Former [2022/34]EE08.12.2021
ES08.12.2021
FI08.12.2021
HR08.12.2021
LT08.12.2021
LV08.12.2021
NL08.12.2021
RO08.12.2021
RS08.12.2021
SE08.12.2021
SM08.12.2021
BG08.03.2022
GR09.03.2022
PT08.04.2022
Former [2022/33]ES08.12.2021
FI08.12.2021
HR08.12.2021
LT08.12.2021
LV08.12.2021
NL08.12.2021
RS08.12.2021
SE08.12.2021
SM08.12.2021
BG08.03.2022
GR09.03.2022
Former [2022/30]ES08.12.2021
FI08.12.2021
HR08.12.2021
LT08.12.2021
LV08.12.2021
NL08.12.2021
RS08.12.2021
SE08.12.2021
BG08.03.2022
GR09.03.2022
Former [2022/24]ES08.12.2021
FI08.12.2021
HR08.12.2021
LT08.12.2021
LV08.12.2021
RS08.12.2021
SE08.12.2021
BG08.03.2022
GR09.03.2022
Former [2022/22]FI08.12.2021
LT08.12.2021
RS08.12.2021
BG08.03.2022
Former [2022/21]RS08.12.2021
BG08.03.2022
Former [2022/19]BG08.03.2022
Documents cited:Search[X]GB342308  (ALEC AVIS) [X] 1-3 * page 1, line 63 - line 78 * * page 2, line 14 - line 19 ** figure 1 *;
 [X]JPS5561913U  (NN) [X] 1-3,7 * figures 3-4; claim 1 *;
 [XI]WO2012065634  (PRYSMIAN SPA [IT], et al) [X] 1-5,7,9,11,13 * page 4, line 12 - line 16 * * page 8, line 29 - page 9, line 15 * * figures 1, 2 * [I] 6,8,10,12;
 [X]JP2014096349  (KANZACC CO LTD) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0019] , [0 23] * * figures 3-4 *
ExaminationJPS5561916U
 JPH11134943
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.