EP3456363 - COMPOSITION FOR REGENERATING BONY TISSUE, METHOD FOR PREPARATION AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.2021 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.08.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.04.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Banc De Sang I Teixits Passeig Taulat, 116 08005 Barcelona / ES | [2019/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VIVES ARMENGOL, Joaquim C/ Sant Elies, 10 01 PB 001 08302 Mataró / ES | 02 /
OLIVER VILA, Irene c/ Bilbao 155, ESC B, 3-4 08018 Barcelona / ES | 03 /
VIVAS PRADILLO, Daniel Ronda Sant Oleguer, 114 4º A 08304 Mataro / ES | 04 /
GRAU VORSTER, Marta Paratge Disseminat, 30 17487 Castello d'Empuries / ES | 05 /
GARCIA LOPEZ, Juan C/Londres 12, 8-2 B 08029 Barcelona / ES | [2020/36] |
Former [2019/12] | 01 /
VIVES ARMENGOL, Joaquim C/ Sant Elies, 10 01 PB 001 08302 Mataró / ES | ||
02 /
OLIVER VILA, Irene c/ BILBAO 155, ESC B, 3-4 08018 BARCELONA / ES | |||
03 /
VIVAS PRADILLO, Daniel RONDA SANT OLEGUER, 114 4º A 08304 MATARO / ES | |||
04 /
GRAU VORSTER, Marta PARATGE DISSEMINAT, 30 17487 CASTELLO D'EMPURIES / ES | |||
05 /
GARCIA LOPEZ, Juan C/LONDRES 12, 8-2 B 08029 BARCELONA / ES | Representative(s) | Durán-Corretjer, S.L.P. Còrsega, 329 (Paseo de Gracia/Diagonal) 08037 Barcelona / ES | [2019/12] | Application number, filing date | 17382614.0 | 18.09.2017 | [2019/12] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3456363 | Date: | 20.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3456363 | Date: | 04.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/22, A61L27/36, A61L27/38, A61L27/44, A61L27/46, A61L27/52, C12N5/0775 | [2019/12] | CPC: |
A61L27/225 (EP);
A61K35/28 (EP);
A61K35/51 (EP);
A61L27/3608 (EP);
A61L27/3834 (EP);
A61L27/3847 (EP);
A61L27/446 (EP);
A61L27/46 (EP);
A61L27/52 (EP);
C12N5/0665 (EP);
A61L2300/64 (EP);
A61L2400/06 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61L27/446, C08L89/00 (EP);
A61L27/46, C08L89/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/19] |
Former [2019/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR REGENERATION VON KNOCHENGEWEBE, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2019/12] | English: | COMPOSITION FOR REGENERATING BONY TISSUE, METHOD FOR PREPARATION AND USE THEREOF | [2019/12] | French: | COMPOSITION POUR LA RÉGÉNÉRATION DE TISSUS OSSEUX, PROCÉDÉ POUR SA PRÉPARATION ET SON UTILISATION | [2019/12] | Examination procedure | 02.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/19] | 02.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.09.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 05.08.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.09.2017 | AL | 04.11.2020 | AT | 04.11.2020 | CY | 04.11.2020 | CZ | 04.11.2020 | DK | 04.11.2020 | EE | 04.11.2020 | FI | 04.11.2020 | HR | 04.11.2020 | LT | 04.11.2020 | LV | 04.11.2020 | MC | 04.11.2020 | NL | 04.11.2020 | PL | 04.11.2020 | RO | 04.11.2020 | RS | 04.11.2020 | SE | 04.11.2020 | SI | 04.11.2020 | SK | 04.11.2020 | SM | 04.11.2020 | BG | 04.02.2021 | NO | 04.02.2021 | GR | 05.02.2021 | IS | 04.03.2021 | PT | 04.03.2021 | [2023/33] |
Former [2023/30] | AL | 04.11.2020 | |
AT | 04.11.2020 | ||
CY | 04.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
MC | 04.11.2020 | ||
NL | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SI | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AL | 04.11.2020 | |
AT | 04.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
MC | 04.11.2020 | ||
NL | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SI | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 04.11.2020 | |
AT | 04.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
NL | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SI | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 04.11.2020 | |
AT | 04.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
NL | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SI | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 04.11.2020 | |
AT | 04.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
NL | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SI | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 04.11.2020 | |
AT | 04.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
NL | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 04.11.2020 | |
AT | 04.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 04.11.2020 | |
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 04.11.2020 | |
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 04.11.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP2361971 (BANC DE SANG I TEIXITS [ES]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [[0008]] * * paragraph [[0022]] - paragraph [[0029]]; claim - *; | [A]WO2015058318 (UNIV CHILE [CL]) [A] 1-15* claim - *; | [I] - EUN-JU KANG ET AL, "In Vitro and In Vivo Osteogenesis of Porcine Skin-Derived Mesenchymal Stem Cell-like Cells with a Demineralized Bone and Fibrin Glue Scaffold", TISSUE ENGINEERING PART A, (20100301), vol. 16, no. 3, doi:10.1089/ten.tea.2009.0439, ISSN 1937-3341, pages 815 - 827, XP055460186 [I] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/ten.tea.2009.0439 | [ID] - LIU GUANGPENG ET AL, "In vitro and in vivo evaluation of osteogenesis of human umbilical cord blood-derived mesenchymal stem cells on partially demineralized bone matrix", TISSUE ENGINEERING. PART A MAR 2010 LNKD- PUBMED:19839720,, (20100118), vol. 16, no. 3, pages 971 - 982, XP002637110 [ID] 1-15 * abstract * | [A] - YOICHI YAMADA ET AL, "Bone regeneration following injection of mesenchymal stem cells and fibrin glue with a biodegradable scaffold", JOURNAL OF CRANIO-MAXILLO-FACIAL SURGERY : OFFICIAL PUBLICATION OF THE EUROPEAN ASSOCIATION FOR CRANIO-MAXILLO-FACIAL SURGERY FEB 2003 LNKD- PUBMED:12553923,, (20030201), vol. 31, no. 1, doi:10.1016/S1010-5182(02)00143-9, pages 27 - 33, XP002637111 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1010-5182(02)00143-9 | by applicant | - DAAR AS; GREENWOOD HL, "A proposed definition of regenerative medicine", J Tissue Eng Regen Med, (20070000), vol. 1, no. 3, pages 179 - 84 | - WHEELER DL; ENNEKING WF, "Allograft bone decreases in strength in vivo over time", Clin Orthop Relat Res, (20050000), vol. 435, pages 36 - 42 | - CHOU LB et al., "Stress fracture as a complication of autogenous bone graft harvest from the distal tibia", Foot Ankle Int, (20070000), vol. 28, no. 2, pages 199 - 201 | - BUCHTA C et al., "Fibrin sealant produced by the CryoSeal FS System: product chemistry, material properties and possible preparation in the autologous preoperative setting", Vox Sang, (20040000), vol. 86, no. 4, pages 257 - 62 | - CARLESS PA et al., "Systematic review of the use of fibrin sealant to minimize perioperative allogeneic blood transfusion", Br J Surg, (20020000), vol. 89, no. 6, pages 695 - 703 | - MANKAD PS; CODISPOTI M., "The role of fibrin sealants in hemostasis", Am J Surg, (20010000), vol. 182, pages 21 S - 8S | - AMRANI DL et al., "Wound healing. Role of commercial fibrin sealants", Ann N Y Acad Sci, (20010000), vol. 936, pages 566 - 79 | - CURRIE LJ et al., "The use of fibrin glue in skin grafts and tissue-engineered skin replacements: a review", Plast Reconstr Surg, (20010000), vol. 108, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1097/00006534-200111000-00045, pages 1713 - 26, XP002973214 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00006534-200111000-00045 | - LIU G et al., "In vitro and in vivo evaluation of osteogenesis of human umbilical cord blood-derived mesenchymal stem cells on partially demineralized bone matrix", Tissue Eng, (20100000), vol. 16, no. 3, pages 971 - 82, XP002637110 |