Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3411104

EP3411104 - MEDICAL DEVICE FOR OLFACTORY STIMULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.11.2018
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  11.08.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  08.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.05.2019New entry: Decision on request for further processing 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Institut National de la Santé et de la Recherche Médicale (INSERM)
101, rue de Tolbiac
75013 Paris / FR
For all designated states
Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique
3, rue Michel Ange
75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR
For all designated states
Université Claude Bernard Lyon 1
43 boulevard du onze novembre 1918
69100 Villeurbanne / FR
For all designated states
Université Jean Monnet Saint Etienne
10 rue Trèfilerie
42100 Saint Etienne / FR
[2018/50]
Inventor(s)01 / THEVENET, Marc
CRNL/UCB LYON 1 - EQUIPE CMO
50 avenue Tony Garnier
69366 Lzon Cedex 07 / FR
02 / VIRET, Patricia
CRNL/UCB LYON 1 - EQUIPE CMO
50 avenue Tony Garnier
69366 Lyon Cedex 07 / FR
 [2018/50]
Representative(s)Nony
11 rue Saint-Georges
75009 Paris / FR
[2018/50]
Application number, filing date17702136.702.02.2017
[2018/50]
WO2017EP52256
Priority number, dateEP2016015396102.02.2016         Original published format: EP 16153961
[2018/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017134166
Date:10.08.2017
Language:EN
[2017/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3411104
Date:12.12.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.2017
[2018/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.08.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61M21/00, A61L9/12, A61M15/00
[2018/50]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/50]
TitleGerman:MEDIZINISCHE VORRICHTUNG ZUR GERUCHSSTIMULIERUNG[2018/50]
English:MEDICAL DEVICE FOR OLFACTORY STIMULATION[2018/50]
French:DISPOSITIF MÉDICAL DE STIMULATION OLFACTIVE[2018/50]
Entry into regional phase30.07.2018National basic fee paid 
30.07.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
30.07.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.07.2018Examination requested  [2018/50]
30.07.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
25.02.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.04.2019Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1}
Request for further processing for:Loss of rights: Claims
16.05.2019Request for further processing filed
16.05.2019Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
24.05.2019Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XYI]US6702767  (DOUGLAS NELSON R [US] ET AL) [X] 1,6,12,13 * The whole document, especially column 4, lines 44-57; column 10, line 50 - column 13, line 35;; figures 7,8; claims 23,24 * [Y] 2,10,11 [I] 3-5,7-9,14;
 [Y]WO9628195  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [Y] 1-14 * page 5, lines 1-28; figures 3-10 * * page 1, lines 11-16 * * page 12, lines 4-21 * * page 13, lines 10-20 * * page 18, lines 12-19 * * page 19, line 24 - page 20, line 2 *;
 [Y]US4934386  (WALKER JAMES C [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-14 * The whole document, especially Fig. 1 and column 4, lines 42-50 *;
 [Y]WO9614792  (SYBARITIC INC [US]) [Y] 1-13 * page 4, lines 14-28; figures 1,2; claims 1,7,13 *;
 [Y]US2013127620  (SIEBERS SCOTT GORDON [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-13 * paragraphs [0079] - [0083]; figure 4A *;
 [Y]DE202004004316U  (WEINECK CHRISTINE [DE]) [Y] 1-13 * paragraphs [0011] , [0014]; figure 1; claims 1,9 *;
 [Y]US2015126803  (RAPOPORT URI [IL]) [Y] 1-14 * paragraphs [0011] , [0013] , [0016] , [0206] - [0208]; figure 1; claim 1 *