Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471889

EP3471889 - PULSATOR VALVE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.01.2020
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  11.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.01.2020New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Husqvarna AB
Drottninggatan 2
561 82 Huskvarna / SE
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / RENNER, Thomas
Birkenweg 9
89079 Ulm / DE
02 / MAAG, Markus
Margarete-Steiff-Strasse 33
89081 Ulm / DE
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Finkele, Rolf
Gardena Manufacturing GmbH Hans-Lorenser-Straße 40
89079 Ulm / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17702610.131.01.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017EP52029
Priority number, dateDE2016100739317.06.2016         Original published format: DE102016007393
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017215794
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471889
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:B05B1/08, A01G25/16, B05B1/30, B05B12/06
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:PULSATORVENTILVORRICHTUNG[2019/17]
English:PULSATOR VALVE DEVICE[2019/17]
French:DISPOSITIF À CLAPET DE PULSATION[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase13.09.2018National basic fee paid 
13.09.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
13.09.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.09.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
13.09.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
23.01.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
09.01.2020Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]US6026851  (ROSENBERG PERETZ [IL]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2009090796  (TIAN LEI [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP2527061  (SIEMENS VAI METALS TECH GMBH [AT]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2013008110  (NETAFIM LTD [IL], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
by applicantUS7500619