Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3410930

EP3410930 - SENSOR ARRANGEMENT AND CATHETER COMPRISING A SENSOR ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  25.10.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.10.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.11.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  11.08.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  15.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 27.11.2019  [2019/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Medyria AG
Technoparkstrasse 2
8406 Winterthur / CH
[2018/50]
Inventor(s)01 / SETTE, Mauro Massimo
Kurlistrasse 90
8404 Winterthur / CH
02 / DI IASIO, Anita
Breitestrasse 61
8400 Winterthur / CH
 [2018/50]
Representative(s)Frenkel, Matthias Alexander
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[2018/50]
Application number, filing date17703399.003.02.2017
[2018/50]
WO2017EP52352
Priority number, dateDE2016100125004.02.2016         Original published format: DE102016001250
[2018/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017134206
Date:10.08.2017
Language:EN
[2017/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3410930
Date:12.12.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.2017
[2018/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3410930
Date:27.11.2019
Language:EN
[2019/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.08.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/026, G01P5/12, G01F1/69, G01F1/684, // A61B5/00
[2019/28]
Former International [2018/50]A61B5/026, G01P5/10, G01F1/68
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/50]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SENSORANORDNUNG UND KATHETER MIT EINER SENSORANORDNUNG[2018/50]
English:SENSOR ARRANGEMENT AND CATHETER COMPRISING A SENSOR ARRANGEMENT[2018/50]
French:AGENCEMENT DE CAPTEUR ET CATHÉTER COMPRENANT UN AGENCEMENT DE CAPTEUR[2018/50]
Entry into regional phase19.07.2018National basic fee paid 
19.07.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
19.07.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.09.2017Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
19.07.2018Examination requested  [2018/50]
19.07.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
17.06.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.10.2019Fee for grant paid
16.10.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.10.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XY]US4637253  (SEKIMURA MASAYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,8,9 * column 1, lines 8-35 * * column 3, lines 13-39 * * column 4, lines 25-68 * * column 7, lines 44-56 * * column 9, lines 10-48 * * figures 1-4,13-15 * [Y] 6,7,10,11;
 [Y]WO2014186912  (MEDYRIA AG [CH]) [Y] 6,7,10,11 * page 11, line 3 - page 15, line 7 * * figures 6,7 *;
 [A]WO2011101813  (CHEVALIER ERIC [CH]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *