Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3414232

EP3414232 - PROCESS TO PREPARE HIGHER ETHYLENE AMINES AND ETHYLENE AMINE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  16.11.2018
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  18.08.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  17.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip29.07.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nouryon Chemicals International B.V.
Velperweg 76
6824BM Arnhem / NL
[2019/34]
Former [2018/51]For all designated states
Akzo Nobel Chemicals International B.V.
Velperweg 76
6824 BM Arnhem / NL
Inventor(s)01 / EDVINSSON, Rolf Krister
Sankte Pers backe 4
433 31 Partille / SE
02 / KANTZER, Eike Nicolas
Decembervägen 13
451 63 Uddevalla / SE
03 / LARSSON, Per Fredrik Olmo
Kommendörsgatan 25H 1001
SE-414 59 NJ Göteborg / SE
04 / LAKE, Karl Fredrik
Gröna Gatan 12
151 32 Södertälje / SE
05 / TEN KATE, Antoon Jacob Berend
Bakenbergseweg 220
6814 MT Arnhem / NL
06 / EHLERS, Ina
Skogsbrynet 11A
444 54 Stenungsund / SE
 [2018/51]
Representative(s)LKGlobal UK Ltd.
Cambridge House, Henry Street
Bath BA1 1BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2018/51]Akzo Nobel Chemicals IP Group
Velperweg 76
6824 BM Arnhem / NL
Application number, filing date17703767.810.02.2017
[2018/51]
WO2017EP52945
Priority number, dateEP2016015554912.02.2016         Original published format: EP 16155549
EP2016015554512.02.2016         Original published format: EP 16155545
[2018/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017137530
Date:17.08.2017
Language:EN
[2017/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3414232
Date:19.12.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.08.2017
[2018/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.08.2017
ClassificationInternational:C07D295/13, C07D233/36
[2018/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/51]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON HÖHEREN ETHYLENAMINEN UND ETHYLENAMINDERIVATEN[2018/51]
English:PROCESS TO PREPARE HIGHER ETHYLENE AMINES AND ETHYLENE AMINE DERIVATIVES[2018/51]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'ÉTHYLÈNEAMINES SUPÉRIEURES ET DÉRIVÉS D'ÉTHYLÈNE AMINE[2018/51]
Entry into regional phase17.07.2018National basic fee paid 
17.07.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
17.07.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.12.2017Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.07.2018Examination requested  [2018/51]
17.07.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
15.03.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]US5491263  (ROONEY PETER C [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * column 1, line 1 - line 6 * * eq. 11;; example 5 *;
 [A]US4684729  (DUQUETTE LAWRENCE G [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * column 1, line 9 - line 16 * * column 3, line 29 - line 38 * * examples 1-4 * * claims 1-4 *
by applicantUS5262534