Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3405219

EP3405219 - A SILICONE WOUND CONTACT LAYER WITH SILVER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  26.10.2018
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.07.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  18.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KCI USA, Inc.
12930 Interstate 10 West
San Antonio, TX 78249 / US
[2018/48]
Inventor(s)01 / ADDISON, Deborah
2 Dovenanter Cottage
Lancaster LA2 8HB / GB
02 / HADLEY, Rachel
9 Sandholme Villas
Earby BB18 6NE / GB
03 / GARVEY, Paul
116a Sunnyside Road
Beeston NG9 4FR / GB
04 / STEPHENS, Sally
3 Hurrs Road
Skipton BD23 2JX / GB
 [2018/48]
Representative(s)Simmons & Simmons
City Point
One Ropemaker Street
London EC2Y 9SS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2018/48]Cordina, Kevin John
Simmons & Simmons LLP
CityPoint
One Ropemaker Street
London EC2Y 9SS / GB
Application number, filing date17704120.917.01.2017
[2018/48]
WO2017US13810
Priority number, dateUS201662280494P19.01.2016         Original published format: US 201662280494 P
[2018/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017127369
Date:27.07.2017
Language:EN
[2017/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3405219
Date:28.11.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.2017
[2018/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.07.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61L15/22, C08L83/04, A61L15/44, A61L15/58
[2018/48]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/48]
TitleGerman:SILIKONWUNDKONTAKTSCHICHT MIT SILBER[2018/48]
English:A SILICONE WOUND CONTACT LAYER WITH SILVER[2018/48]
French:COUCHE SILICONÉE À BASE D'ARGENT DESTINÉE À VENIR EN CONTACT AVEC UNE PLAIE[2018/48]
Entry into regional phase14.08.2018National basic fee paid 
14.08.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
14.08.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.08.2018Examination requested  [2018/48]
14.08.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
11.02.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[ID]US2013165837  (ADDISON DEBORAH [GB] ET AL) [ID] 1-34 * page 1, paragraphs 11, 12, 16 * * page 2, paragraphs 31, 32 * * page 3, paragraph 40 *;
 [A]US2014058309  (ADDISON DEBORAH [GB] ET AL) [A] 1-34 * page 1, paragraph 15 * * page 3, paragraph 32 *;
 [A]WO2013056045  (DOW CORNING COPORATION [US]; DOW CORNING TAIWAN INC) [A] 1-34 * page 10, paragraph 44 - page 11 *;
 [A]EP2643412  (SMITH & NEPHEW [GB]; BLUESTAR SILICONES FRANCE [FR]) [A] 1-34 * page 12, paragraphs 88, 89 *
by applicantEP0251810
 WO8705206
 EP0342950
 US6846508
 US5891076
 JPH1095072
 EP0117632
 US2013165837