Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469651

EP3469651 - METHOD FOR DYNAMIC HEAT SENSING IN HYPERSONIC APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  21.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Raytheon Company
870 Winter Street
Waltham, MA 02451 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / STRATIS, Glafkos, K.
6077 Oak Bluff Way
Lake Worth Florida 33467 / US
02 / VANDERWYST, Anton
2908 East Cushman Drive
Tucson Arizona 85716 / US
03 / SUNNE, Wayne, L.
3838 E. Calle Barcelona
Tucson Arizona 85716 / US
04 / DERRICK, David, G.
1322 E. Camino Aurelia
Vail Arizona 85641 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Dentons UK and Middle East LLP
One Fleet Place
London EC4M 7WS / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17704594.523.01.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017US14509
Priority number, dateUS20161517670008.06.2016         Original published format: US201615176700
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017213713
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469651
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:H01Q1/00, F42B10/46, F42B15/34, H01Q1/28, H01Q1/42, H01Q5/22
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR DYNAMISCHEN WÄRMEMESSUNG BEI HYPERSCHALLANWENDUNGEN[2019/16]
English:METHOD FOR DYNAMIC HEAT SENSING IN HYPERSONIC APPLICATIONS[2019/16]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION DYNAMIQUE DE LA CHALEUR DANS DES APPLICATIONS HYPERSONIQUES[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase03.01.2019National basic fee paid 
03.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
03.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
03.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[YA]US3410502  (LEADON BERNARD M ET AL) [Y] 1-13,19 * abstract * * column 3, line 26 - line 57 * * column 4, line 10 - line 16 * * column 1, line 22 - line 23 * [A] 14-18,20;
 [YA]US3120364  (STALONY-DOBRZANSKI JANUSZ A) [Y] 1-13,19 * figure 1; claim 1 * [A] 14-18,20;
 [A]US4968879  (CLARK LARRY T [US]) [A] 1-13,19 * abstract *;
 [A]US2014117241  (CORCOS DAN [IL] ET AL) [A] 2-11,13,19 * abstract *;
 [A]US6329649  (JACK MICHAEL D [US] ET AL) [A] 2-11,13,19 * abstract *;
 [A]US5372333  (UWIRA BERND [DE] ET AL) [A] 1-20 * abstract *