Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3417021

EP3417021 - AMPHIPHILIC COPOLYMERS WITH MIXED FUNCTIONALITIES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.12.2019
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  23.11.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.09.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  25.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip06.12.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
3M Innovative Properties Company
3M Center
Post Office Box 33427
St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
[2018/52]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHUELL, Christoph
Carl Schurzstrasse 1
D-41453 Neuss / DE
02 / STRERATH, Christiane
Carl Schurzstrasse 1
D-41453 Neuss / DE
03 / JING, Naiyong
3M Center
Post OfficeBox 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
04 / GOEB, Siegfried
Carl Schurzstrasse 1
D-41453 Neuss / DE
 [2018/52]
Representative(s)Gabriel, Kiroubagaranne
3M Belgium B.V.B.A./S.P.R.L.
Hermeslaan 7
1831 Diegem / BE
[2018/52]
Application number, filing date17705548.010.02.2017
[2018/52]
WO2017US17350
Priority number, dateEP2016015650819.02.2016         Original published format: EP 16156508
[2018/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017142802
Date:24.08.2017
Language:EN
[2017/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3417021
Date:26.12.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.08.2017
[2018/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.08.2017
ClassificationInternational:C09D133/16, C08F220/22, C08F220/34, C08F220/38, C08F230/02, C08F230/08
[2018/52]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/52]
TitleGerman:AMPHIPHILE COPOLYMERE MIT GEMISCHTEN FUNKTIONALITÄTEN[2018/52]
English:AMPHIPHILIC COPOLYMERS WITH MIXED FUNCTIONALITIES[2018/52]
French:COPOLYMÈRES AMPHIPHILES AVEC FONCTIONNALITÉS MIXTES[2018/52]
Entry into regional phase24.08.2018National basic fee paid 
24.08.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
24.08.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.08.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.08.2018Examination requested  [2018/52]
24.08.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
05.12.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XA]WO2008154279  (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al) [X] 1-13,15 * examples 6,7,9,10 * [A] 14;
 [X]US2009111344  (MURPHY PETER MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1-7,11-13,15 * paragraphs [0118] - [0123]; example 1; claim 1 *;
 [X]JPS60262870  (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS) [X] 1-5,11-13,15 * abstract *;
 [XP]WO2016028499  (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [XP] 1-13,15 * table 2 *
by applicantUS2008319153
 US2014048478