Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3426952

EP3426952 - METHOD FOR CHECKING THE CONFIGURATION SAFETY OF A COUPLING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  14.12.2018
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  15.09.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  07.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip25.01.2020New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Renault S.A.S.
13-15 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo
92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
For all designated states
NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD.
2, Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku, Yokohama-shi
Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP
[2019/03]
Inventor(s)01 / CHAMEROY, Adrien
44 Rue de Serpentine
78960 VOISINS-LE-BRETONNEUX / FR
02 / CHANTREL, Cédric
13 Rue Jean Pigeon
94220 CHARENTON LE PONT / FR
 [2019/03]
Representative(s)Rougemont, Bernard
Renault s.a.s
TCR GRA 2 36 - Sce 00267
1, Avenue du Golf
78084 Guyancourt Cedex / FR
[2019/03]
Application number, filing date17707368.125.01.2017
[2019/03]
WO2017FR50168
Priority number, dateFR2016005200910.03.2016         Original published format: FR 1652009
[2019/03]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017153645
Date:14.09.2017
Language:FR
[2017/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3426952
Date:16.01.2019
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2017
[2019/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.09.2017
ClassificationInternational:F16H61/28, F16H63/50, F16H59/68, F16H61/12, F16H61/04
[2019/03]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/03]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERPRÜFUNG DER KONFIGURATIONSSICHERHEIT EINER KUPPLUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2019/03]
English:METHOD FOR CHECKING THE CONFIGURATION SAFETY OF A COUPLING DEVICE[2019/03]
French:PROCEDE DE CONTROLE SECURITAIRE DE LA CONFIGURATION D'UN DISPOSITIF D'ACCOUPLEMENT[2019/03]
Entry into regional phase12.06.2018National basic fee paid 
12.06.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
12.06.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.06.2018Examination requested  [2019/03]
12.06.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
02.04.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
23.01.2020Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0242086  (EATON CORP [US]) [X] 1-9 * figure 2 * * column 2 * * column 5, line 29 - line 40 * * column 5, line 48 - line 49 * * column 7, line 50 - column 8, line 27 * * column 8, line 31 - line 58 * * claim 1 *;
 [A]US6019698  (LAWRIE ROBERT E [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * figures 11a, 11b * * column 3, line 51 - line 57 * * column 14, line 1 - line 3 *