Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3413929

EP3413929 - DEVICE FOR CLEANING A HEARING AID [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  16.11.2018
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  18.08.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  07.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip12.08.2019New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee 
12.08.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MG Developpement
100 Rue Joseph Alois Schumpeter
34470 Perols / FR
[2018/51]
Inventor(s)01 / GIL, José
100 Rue J.A. Schumpeter
34470 Perols / FR
 [2018/51]
Representative(s)Rhein, Alain
Cabinet BREV&SUD
55 Avenue Clément Ader
34170 Castelnau le Lez / FR
[2018/51]
Application number, filing date17707387.108.02.2017
[2018/51]
WO2017FR50280
Priority number, dateFR2016005097408.02.2016         Original published format: FR 1650974
FR2016005097708.02.2016         Original published format: FR 1650977
[2018/51]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017137695
Date:17.08.2017
Language:FR
[2017/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3413929
Date:19.12.2018
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.08.2017
[2018/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.08.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61L2/18, B08B3/10
[2018/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/51]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR REINIGUNG EINES HÖRGERÄTS[2018/51]
English:DEVICE FOR CLEANING A HEARING AID[2018/51]
French:DISPOSITIF DE NETTOYAGE D'UNE PROTHÈSE AUDITIVE[2018/51]
Entry into regional phase07.08.2018National basic fee paid 
07.08.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
07.08.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.08.2018Examination requested  [2018/51]
07.08.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
20.03.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.201903   M06   Fee paid on   08.08.2019
Cited inInternational search[XYI]US2008253579  (CRONIN JOHN [US] ET AL) [X] 1,6,7 * paragraphs [0064] , [0076] - [0086] - [0094] - [0096]; figure 3; claim - * [Y] 3 [I] 2,4,5,8-10;
 [YD]US2013220385  (GIL JOSE ANTONIO [FR]) [YD] 3 * paragraphs [0023] - [0027] - [0045] - [0118]; figure -; claim - *;
 [A]US2010189598  (FRAUNDORFER MARK ROBERT [NZ]) [A] 1 * the whole document *