Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3416869

EP3416869 - STEERING MOTOR SUSPENSION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  25.10.2019
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.06.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  23.11.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.09.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  08.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 27.11.2019  [2019/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CNH Industrial Italia S.P.A.
Via Plava 8
10135 Turin / IT
[2018/52]
Inventor(s)01 / SIMONI, Marco
Via Togliatti 1
41030 Bastiglia Modena / IT
 [2018/52]
Representative(s)CNH Industrial IP Department
Patent Department
Leon Claeysstraat 3A
8210 Zedelgem / BE
[2018/52]
Application number, filing date17707490.315.02.2017
[2018/52]
WO2017EP53350
Priority number, dateIT2016UB0074415.02.2016         Original published format: IT UB20160744
[2018/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017140704
Date:24.08.2017
Language:EN
[2017/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3416869
Date:26.12.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.08.2017
[2018/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3416869
Date:27.11.2019
Language:EN
[2019/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.08.2017
ClassificationInternational:B62D1/16, F16F1/373, B62D7/22
[2018/52]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/52]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:LENKMOTORAUFHÄNGUNG[2018/52]
English:STEERING MOTOR SUSPENSION[2018/52]
French:SUSPENSION DE MOTEUR DE DIRECTION[2018/52]
Entry into regional phase17.09.2018National basic fee paid 
17.09.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
17.09.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.09.2018Examination requested  [2018/52]
17.09.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
19.06.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.10.2019Fee for grant paid
15.10.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.10.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]US2007007069  (HAMASAKI YOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0038]; figures 1-3; claims 1,14 *;
 [A]US2005236216  (KATAGIRI AKIRA [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0061]; figures 1-9 *;
 [A]US2010140855  (GUSTAVSSON BENGT-GOERAN [SE]) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0032]; figures 1-7 *