Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3465621

EP3465621 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR FACILITATING TRACKING A TARGET IN AN IMAGED SCENE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  08.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Raytheon Company
870 Winter Street
Waltham, MA 02451-1449 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / FRANKLIN, Craig R.
c/o Raytheon Company
870 Winter Street
Waltham, Massachusetts 02451-1449 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Dentons UK and Middle East LLP
One Fleet Place
London EC4M 7WS / GB
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17707709.630.01.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017US15610
Priority number, dateUS20161516516626.05.2016         Original published format: US201615165166
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017204864
Date:30.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3465621
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:G06T7/90, H04N1/60, G06T5/00
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUM VERFOLGEN EINES ZIELS IN EINER BILDERSZENE[2019/15]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR FACILITATING TRACKING A TARGET IN AN IMAGED SCENE[2019/15]
French:SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR FACILITER LA POURSUITE D'UNE CIBLE DANS UNE SCÈNE IMAGÉE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase19.12.2018National basic fee paid 
19.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
19.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
19.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]US6621924  (OGINO TOMOTAKA [JP], et al) [Y] 1-21 * abstract * * column 1, line 23 - line 33 * * column 4, line 11 - column 28 *
 [Y]  - STERN H ET AL, "Adaptive color space switching for tracking under varying illumination", IMAGE AND VISION COMPUTING, ELSEVIER, GUILDFORD, GB, vol. 23, no. 3, ISSN 0262-8856, (20050301), pages 353 - 364, (20050301), XP027617868 [Y] 1-21 * abstract * * page 353, column 1, section 1 - p. 345, column 2, section 4, Case (a) *