Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3408398

EP3408398 - RECOMBINANT ADENOVIRUS VECTORED FMDV VACCINES AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  25.10.2019
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.07.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  02.11.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  04.08.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  10.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 27.11.2019  [2019/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Boehringer Ingelheim Animal Health USA Inc.
3239 Satellite Boulevard, Bldg. 500
Duluth, GA 30096 / US
For all designated states
GenVec, Inc.
65 West Watkins Mill Road
Gaithersburg, MD 20878 / US
For all designated states
The Government Of The United States Of America As Represented By The Secretary Of Homeland Security
Plum Island Animal Disease Center
PO Box 848
Greenport, NY 11944 / US
[N/P]
Former [2019/41]For all designated states
Boehringer Ingelheim Animal Health USA Inc.
3239 Satellite Boulevard, Bldg. 500
Duluth, GA 30096 / US
For all designated states
GenVec, Inc.
65 West Watkins Mill Road
Gaithersburg, MD 20878 / US
For all designated states
The Government Of The United States Of America As Represented By The Secretary Of Homeland Security
Plum Island Animal Desease Center
PO Box 848
Greenport, NY 11944 / US
Former [2018/49]For all designated states
Merial, Inc.
3239 Satellite Boulevard
Duluth, GA 30096 / US
For all designated states
GenVec, Inc.
65 West Watkins Mill Road
Gaithersburg, MD 20878 / US
For all designated states
The Government Of The United States Of America As Represented By The Secretary Of Homeland Security
Plum Island Animal Desease Center
PO Box 848
Greenport, NY 11944 / US
Inventor(s)01 / WIDENER, Justin
657 Nantahala Avenue
Athens GA 30601 / US
02 / WOODYARD, Leszlie
1167 Charlie Bolton Rd
Hull GA 30646 / US
03 / SIGER, Leonardo
1141 Willowynd Way
Waltkinsville GA 30677 / US
04 / ETTYREDDY, Damodar
22480 Castleoak Road
Clarksburg MD 20871 / US
05 / GALL, Jason
31 Bronco Court
Germantown MD 20874 / US
06 / MCVEY, Duncan
6016 Muncaster Mill Road
Derwood MD 20855 / US
07 / BURRAGE, Tom
3 Tanager Drive
Topsham ME 04086 / US
08 / BROUGH, Douglas
9121 Tulip Grove Road
Gaithersburg MA 20879 / US
 [2019/48]
Former [2019/11]01 / WIDENER, Justin
657 Nantahala Avenue
Athens GA 30601 / US
02 / WOODYWARD, Leszlie
1167 Charlie Bolton Rd
Hull GA 30646 / US
03 / SIGER, Leonardo
1141 Willowynd Way
Waltkinsville GA 30677 / US
04 / ETTYREDDY, Damodar
22480 Castleoak Road
Clarksburg MD 20871 / US
05 / GALL, Jason
31 Bronco Court
Germantown MD 20874 / US
06 / MCVEY, Duncan
6016 Muncaster Mill Road
Derwood MD 20855 / US
07 / BURRAGE, Tom
3 Tanager Drive
Topsham ME 04086 / US
08 / BROUGH, Douglas
9121 Tulip Grove Road
Gaithersburg MA 20879 / US
Former [2018/49]01 / WIDENER, Justin
657 Nantahala Avenue
Athens GA 30601 / US
02 / WOODYWARD, Leszlie
1167 Charlie Bolton Rd
Hull GA 30646 / US
03 / SIGER, Leonardo
1141 Willowynd Way
Waltkinsville GA 30677 / US
04 / ETTYREDDY, Damodar
22480 Castleoak Road
Clarksburg MD 20871 / US
05 / GALL, Jason
31 Bronco Court
Germantown MD 20874 / US
06 / MCVEY, Duncan
6016 Muncaster Mill Road
Derwood MD 20855 / US
07 / BURRAGE, Tom
201 Village Pond Road
Guilford CT 06347 / US
08 / BROUGH, Douglas
9121 Tulip Grove Road
Gaithersburg MA 20879 / US
Representative(s)D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[2018/49]
Application number, filing date17708002.530.01.2017
[2018/49]
WO2017US15622
Priority number, dateUS201662288540P29.01.2016         Original published format: US 201662288540 P
[2018/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017132666
Date:03.08.2017
Language:EN
[2017/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3408398
Date:05.12.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.08.2017
[2018/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3408398
Date:27.11.2019
Language:EN
[2019/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.08.2017
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/86
[2018/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/49]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:REKOMBINANTE ADENOVIRUS-VEKTORISIERTE FMDV-IMPFSTOFFE UND DEREN VERWENDUNGEN[2018/49]
English:RECOMBINANT ADENOVIRUS VECTORED FMDV VACCINES AND USES THEREOF[2018/49]
French:VACCINS VECTORISÉS À ADÉNOVIRUS RECOMBINANTS CONTRE LE VIRUS DE LA FIÈVRE APHTEUSE (FMDV) ET UTILISATIONS CORRESPONDANTES[2018/49]
Entry into regional phase29.08.2018National basic fee paid 
29.08.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
29.08.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.08.2018Examination requested  [2018/49]
29.08.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
12.03.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.07.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.10.2019Fee for grant paid
16.10.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.10.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO2007059461  (GENVEC INC [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,9-13 * paragraph [0058]; claims 9,15 * * paragraph [0080] * [I] 4,8;
 [X]US2005287672  (NORDGREN ROBERT [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5-13 * paragraph [0092] - paragraph [0106]; figure 1; claim 5 *;
 [X]WO2012003129  (US AGRICULTURE [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5-13 * paragraph [0091]; example 12; claims 1-26 *;
 [A]  - "Foot-and-mouth disease virus derived protein, SEQ 107.", Geneseq, (20140717), Database accession no. BBG42659, URL: EBI, XP002769370 [A] 4 * the whole document *
by applicantCA2047585
 US8323663
 US7531182
 US2016220659
 US2011236416
 US7371395
 US4708871
 US5846946
 US6451769
 US6852705
 US6818628
 US6586412
 US6576243
 US6558674
 US6464984
 US6451770
 US6376473
 US6221362
 EP0260148
 EP0323597
 US5168062
 US5385839
 US4968615
 WO8703905
 WO8901036
 US5122458
 US5505941
 US5494807
 US7527960
 WO9901158
 WO9634109
 US6919084
 US6358500
 WO9816247
 US2909462
 US7691368
 US2011129494
    - COOPER ET AL., INTERVIROLOGY, (1978), vol. 10, pages 165 - 180
    - KLEID, SCIENCE, (1981), vol. 214, pages 1125 - 1129
    - BELSHAM G. J., PROGRESS IN BIOPHYSICS AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (1993), vol. 60, pages 241 - 261
    - ROWLANDS ET AL., J. GEN. VIROL., (1975), vol. 26, pages 227 - 238
    - RWEYEMAMU ET AL., ARCHIVES OF VIROLOGY, (1979), vol. 59, pages 69 - 79
    - GRUBMAN ET AL., VACCINE, (1993), vol. 11, pages 825 - 829
    - LEWIS ET AL., J. VIROL., (1991), vol. 65, pages 6572 - 6580
    - GRAVES, JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (1963), vol. 91, pages 251 - 256
    - BRUN ET AL., DEVELOPMENTS IN BIOLOGICAL STANDARDISATION, (1977), vol. 25, pages 117 - 122
    - GEYSEN ET AL., PNAS USA, (1984), vol. 81, no. 13, pages 3998 - 4400
    - GEYSEN ET AL., PNAS USA, (1985), vol. 82, no. 1, pages 178 - 182
    - WILBUR; LIPMAN, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1983), vol. 80, pages 726 - 730
    - HARTIKKA ET AL., HUM GENE THER, (1996), vol. 7, no. 10, pages 1205 - 1217
    - NI, M. ET AL., PLANT J, (1995), vol. 7, pages 661 - 676
    - BOSHART ET AL., CELL, (1985), vol. 41, no. 2, pages 521 - 30
    - KWISSA ET AL., VACCINE, (2000), vol. 18, no. 22, pages 2337 - 2344
    - MIYAZAKI ET AL., GENE, (1989), vol. 79, no. 2, pages 269 - 277
    - CALLIS ET AL., GENES & DEV., (198712), vol. 1, no. 10, pages 1183 - 1200
    - VAN OOYEN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1979), vol. 206, no. 4416, pages 337 - 344
    - BEVAN, NAR, (1984), vol. 12, no. 22, pages 8711 - 8721
    - BARCENA; LORENZO ET AL., J GEN VIROL., (2000), vol. 81, no. 4, pages 1073 - 1085
    - COCHRAN ET AL., J VIROL, (1985), vol. 54, no. 1, pages 30 - 37
    - RIVIERE ET AL., J VIROL, (1992), vol. 66, no. 6, pages 3424 - 3434
    - SHIDA, VIROLOGY, (1986), vol. 150, no. 2, pages 451 - 462
    - FUNAHASHI ET AL., J GEN VIROL, (1988), vol. 69, no. 1, pages 35 - 47
    - TAYLOR ET AL., VACCINE, (1988), vol. 6, no. 6, pages 504 - 508
    - GUO ET AL., J VIROL, (1989), vol. 63, no. 10, pages 4189 - 4198
    - PERKUS ET AL., J VIROL, (1989), vol. 63, no. 9, pages 3829 - 3836
    - CHIN SCI BULL, (2006), vol. 51, no. 17, pages 2072 - 2078
    - KLINMAN ET AL., PNAS USA, (1996), vol. 93, no. 7, pages 2879 - 2883
    - M. POWELL; M. NEWMAN, Vaccine Design, The Subunit and Adjuvant Approach, PLENUM PRESS, (1995), vol. 6, page 147,183
    - PHARMEUROPA, (199606), vol. 8, no. 2
 WO2004US22605