Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP3264956 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3264956



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 2403
13.03.2024 Communication of the Registry during review procedure Appeal 1
13.03.2024 Communication of the Registry during review procedure Appeal 1
01.02.2024 Order from the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure Appeal 1
02.01.2024 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
02.01.2024 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure Appeal 18
02.01.2024 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure Appeal 21
02.01.2024 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure Appeal 10
02.01.2024 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure Appeal 9
02.01.2024 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure Appeal 2
02.01.2024 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure Appeal 19
02.01.2024 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure Appeal 56
02.01.2024 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure Appeal 29
02.01.2024 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure Appeal 4
02.01.2024 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure Appeal 4
02.01.2024 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure Appeal 5
02.01.2024 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure Appeal 52
02.01.2024 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure Appeal 23
02.01.2024 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure Appeal 26
02.01.2024 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure Appeal 1
02.01.2024 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
02.01.2024 Letter relating to review procedure Appeal 26
14.11.2023 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
14.11.2023 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
14.11.2023 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
06.11.2023 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.11.2023 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 24
02.11.2023 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 24
02.11.2023 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
02.11.2023 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
02.11.2023 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
31.10.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
31.10.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
31.10.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
31.10.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
31.10.2023 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
31.10.2023 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
06.10.2023 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
06.10.2023 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
06.10.2023 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
06.10.2023 F3317 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Proprietor + Opponent) Appeal 3
06.10.2023 F3317 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Proprietor + Opponent) Appeal 3
22.09.2023 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.09.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
21.09.2023 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
21.09.2023 Amended description with annotations Appeal 1
21.09.2023 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 02 Appeal 4
21.09.2023 Description Appeal 1
21.09.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
21.09.2023 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
06.09.2023 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
06.09.2023 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
06.09.2023 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.09.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
05.09.2023 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 5
05.09.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
05.09.2023 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 23
14.08.2023 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.08.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
09.08.2023 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
09.08.2023 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Appeal 2
26.05.2023 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 19
26.05.2023 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 19
06.02.2023 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
01.02.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
01.02.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
01.02.2023 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
22.12.2022 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.12.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
19.12.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
19.12.2022 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 8
14.12.2022 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.12.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
09.12.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
09.12.2022 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
11.10.2022 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 3
11.10.2022 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 3
11.10.2022 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
11.10.2022 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
06.10.2022 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
22.09.2022 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
27.07.2022 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
26.07.2022 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.07.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
21.07.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 4
21.07.2022 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
21.07.2022 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
21.07.2022 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
21.07.2022 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
21.07.2022 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
21.07.2022 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
21.07.2022 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
21.07.2022 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
21.07.2022 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
21.07.2022 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
21.07.2022 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
21.07.2022 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
21.07.2022 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
21.07.2022 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
21.07.2022 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
21.07.2022 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
21.07.2022 Amended description with annotations Appeal 1
21.07.2022 Amended description with annotations Appeal 2
21.07.2022 Amended description with annotations Appeal 2
21.07.2022 Amended description with annotations Appeal 1
21.07.2022 Amended description with annotations Appeal 1
21.07.2022 Amended description with annotations Appeal 2
21.07.2022 Amended description with annotations Appeal 1
21.07.2022 Amended description with annotations Appeal 2
21.07.2022 Amended description with annotations Appeal 1
21.07.2022 Amended description with annotations Appeal 2
21.07.2022 Amended description with annotations Appeal 2
21.07.2022 Amended description with annotations Appeal 2
21.07.2022 Amended description with annotations Appeal 2
21.07.2022 Amended description with annotations Appeal 2
21.07.2022 Amended description with annotations Appeal 2
21.07.2022 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 01 Appeal 3
21.07.2022 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 02 Appeal 3
21.07.2022 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 03 Appeal 3
21.07.2022 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 04 Appeal 3
21.07.2022 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 05 Appeal 3
21.07.2022 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 06 Appeal 3
21.07.2022 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 07 Appeal 3
21.07.2022 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 08 Appeal 3
21.07.2022 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 09 Appeal 3
21.07.2022 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 10 Appeal 3
21.07.2022 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 11 Appeal 3
21.07.2022 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 12 Appeal 3
21.07.2022 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 13 Appeal 3
21.07.2022 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 14 Appeal 3
21.07.2022 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 15 Appeal 3
21.07.2022 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 16 Appeal 3
21.07.2022 Description Appeal 1
21.07.2022 Description Appeal 2
21.07.2022 Description Appeal 1
21.07.2022 Description Appeal 2
21.07.2022 Description Appeal 1
21.07.2022 Description Appeal 1
21.07.2022 Description Appeal 2
21.07.2022 Description Appeal 1
21.07.2022 Description Appeal 2
21.07.2022 Description Appeal 1
21.07.2022 Description Appeal 2
21.07.2022 Description Appeal 2
21.07.2022 Description Appeal 2
21.07.2022 Description Appeal 1
21.07.2022 Description Appeal 1
21.07.2022 Description Appeal 2
21.07.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
21.07.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 4
21.07.2022 Main request during appeals procedure Appeal 2
21.07.2022 Reply to appeal Appeal 9
21.07.2022 Reply to appeal Appeal 21
21.03.2022 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
21.03.2022 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
15.03.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
15.03.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
15.03.2022 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
15.03.2022 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 5
14.03.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
14.03.2022 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
14.03.2022 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 16
14.03.2022 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Appeal 2
20.01.2022 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
20.01.2022 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
17.01.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
17.01.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
17.01.2022 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
14.01.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
14.01.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
14.01.2022 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
15.12.2021 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
15.12.2021 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.11.2021 Advice of delivery Opposition 3
05.11.2021 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 9
05.11.2021 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
05.11.2021 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 16
05.11.2021 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 15
05.11.2021 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
05.11.2021 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
05.11.2021 Means of redress Opposition 2
05.11.2021 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
05.11.2021 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
05.11.2021 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
05.11.2021 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
05.11.2021 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 6
05.11.2021 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 1
05.11.2021 Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition Opposition 56
05.11.2021 Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition Opposition 56
28.10.2021 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
20.05.2021 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 13
18.05.2021 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 5
17.05.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
17.05.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
17.05.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
17.05.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 11 Opposition 2
17.05.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 11 Opposition 3
17.05.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
17.05.2021 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
14.05.2021 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 20
10.05.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
10.05.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
10.05.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
10.05.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 10 Opposition 2
10.05.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 10 Opposition 3
10.05.2021 Citation in opposition procedure - 016 Opposition 4
10.05.2021 Consolidated list of cited opposition documents Opposition 1
10.05.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
10.05.2021 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 9
29.04.2021 Consolidated list of cited opposition documents Opposition 1
31.03.2021 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 94
30.03.2021 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 21
18.03.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
18.03.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
18.03.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
18.03.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
18.03.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
18.03.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
18.03.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
18.03.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
18.03.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
18.03.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
18.03.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
18.03.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
18.03.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
18.03.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
18.03.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
18.03.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
18.03.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
18.03.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
18.03.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 02 Opposition 2
18.03.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 02 Opposition 3
18.03.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 03 Opposition 2
18.03.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 03 Opposition 3
18.03.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 04 Opposition 2
18.03.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 04 Opposition 3
18.03.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 05 Opposition 2
18.03.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 05 Opposition 4
18.03.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 06 Opposition 3
18.03.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 06 Opposition 2
18.03.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 07 Opposition 3
18.03.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 07 Opposition 2
18.03.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 08 Opposition 3
18.03.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 08 Opposition 2
18.03.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 09 Opposition 4
18.03.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 09 Opposition 2
18.03.2021 Citation in opposition procedure - 011 Opposition 13
18.03.2021 Citation in opposition procedure - 011 Opposition 13
18.03.2021 Citation in opposition procedure - 012 Opposition 17
18.03.2021 Citation in opposition procedure - 013 Opposition 10
18.03.2021 Citation in opposition procedure - 013 Opposition 11
18.03.2021 Citation in opposition procedure - 014 Opposition 27
18.03.2021 Citation in opposition procedure - 014 Opposition 23
18.03.2021 Citation in opposition procedure - 015 Opposition 21
18.03.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
18.03.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 3
18.03.2021 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 20
18.03.2021 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 13
06.03.2021 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 18
24.02.2021 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 3
24.02.2021 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 3
21.01.2021 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
21.01.2021 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
21.01.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
30.07.2020 Advice of delivery Opposition 3
15.07.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
15.07.2020 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.07.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
08.07.2020 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
08.07.2020 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
08.07.2020 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
08.07.2020 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
08.07.2020 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.07.2020 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.06.2020 Advice of delivery Opposition 3
17.06.2020 Advice of delivery Opposition 3
09.06.2020 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.06.2020 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.05.2020 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 101
13.05.2020 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 8
30.04.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 3
30.04.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
30.04.2020 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
30.04.2020 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
30.04.2020 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
30.04.2020 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
30.04.2020 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
30.04.2020 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
30.04.2020 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
30.04.2020 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
30.04.2020 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
30.04.2020 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
30.04.2020 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
30.04.2020 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
30.04.2020 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
30.04.2020 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
30.04.2020 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
30.04.2020 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
30.04.2020 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
30.04.2020 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 01 Opposition 3
30.04.2020 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 01 Opposition 2
30.04.2020 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 02 Opposition 3
30.04.2020 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 02 Opposition 2
30.04.2020 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 03 Opposition 3
30.04.2020 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 03 Opposition 2
30.04.2020 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 04 Opposition 3
30.04.2020 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 04 Opposition 2
30.04.2020 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 05 Opposition 3
30.04.2020 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 05 Opposition 2
30.04.2020 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 06 Opposition 4
30.04.2020 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 06 Opposition 2
30.04.2020 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 07 Opposition 4
30.04.2020 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 07 Opposition 2
30.04.2020 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 08 Opposition 3
30.04.2020 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 08 Opposition 2
30.04.2020 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 09 Opposition 2
30.04.2020 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 09 Opposition 3
30.04.2020 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
30.04.2020 Citation in opposition procedure - 010 Opposition 5
30.04.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 3
30.04.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
30.04.2020 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 9
30.04.2020 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 7
06.03.2020 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 18
11.11.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
11.11.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.11.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.11.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
05.11.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
05.11.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
05.11.2019 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
05.11.2019 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
05.11.2019 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.11.2019 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.08.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 35
30.07.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
30.07.2019 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
30.07.2019 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
30.07.2019 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 01 Opposition 2
30.07.2019 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 01 Opposition 4
30.07.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
30.07.2019 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
30.07.2019 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 17
21.03.2019 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
21.03.2019 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 2
11.03.2019 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
06.03.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
06.03.2019 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 18
06.03.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 001 Opposition 14
06.03.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 002 Opposition 24
06.03.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 003 Opposition 4
06.03.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 004 Opposition 52
06.03.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 005 Opposition 57
06.03.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 006 Opposition 31
06.03.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 007 Opposition 18
06.03.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 008 Opposition 13
06.03.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 009 Opposition 41
06.03.2019 Notice of opposition Opposition 18
06.03.2019 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
12.09.2018 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
18.06.2018 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
11.05.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
20.04.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.04.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.04.2018 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
19.04.2018 Communication regarding the forthcoming grant Search / examination 2
11.04.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.04.2018 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
11.04.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
11.04.2018 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
11.04.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
14.03.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
14.03.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
14.03.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
14.03.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 24
14.03.2018 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 24
19.02.2018 Examination started Search / examination 1
13.12.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
13.12.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
13.12.2017 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
02.10.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
02.10.2017 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
02.10.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 10
02.10.2017 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
02.10.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 9
02.10.2017 Amended drawings filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 7
02.10.2017 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
02.10.2017 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
02.10.2017 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
22.09.2017 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 40
31.08.2017 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 37
31.08.2017 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
31.08.2017 Published international application - A1 Search / examination 37
09.05.2017 ISR: cited documents International Searching Authority 2
08.05.2017 Incoming letter related to ISA procedure International Searching Authority 2
08.05.2017 Incoming letter related to ISA procedure International Searching Authority 1
08.05.2017 Notification Concerning Documents Transmitted (copy for ISA/EP) International Searching Authority 2
08.05.2017 Substitute sheet (Rule 26) - drawings for ISA/EP International Searching Authority 7
08.05.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII International Searching Authority 2
08.05.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet International Searching Authority 1
08.05.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box International Searching Authority 3
16.03.2017 Notification of receipt of Search copy International Searching Authority 1
03.03.2017 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
03.03.2017 Claims International Searching Authority 9
03.03.2017 Description International Searching Authority 19
03.03.2017 Drawings International Searching Authority 7
03.03.2017 Fee calculation sheet for an international application International Searching Authority 2
03.03.2017 Incoming letter related to ISA procedure International Searching Authority 1
03.03.2017 Invitation to Correct Defects in the International Application (copy for ISA/EP) International Searching Authority 6
03.03.2017 Notification Concerning Documents Transmitted (copy for ISA/EP) International Searching Authority 2
03.03.2017 Notification Concerning Payment of Prescribed Fees (copy for ISA/EP) International Searching Authority 2
03.03.2017 Notification of the International Application Number and of the International Filing Date (copy for ISA/EP) International Searching Authority 1
03.03.2017 Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) International Searching Authority 4