Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3426173

EP3426173 - METHOD FOR PROVIDING SUB-ELEMENTS OF A MULTIPART IMPLANT OR A MULTIPART OSTEOSYNTHESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  14.12.2018
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  15.09.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  15.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.05.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 19.06.2019  [2019/25]
17.05.2019Change - extension statespublished on 19.06.2019  [2019/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Universität Basel, Vizerektorat Forschung
Petersgraben 35
4003 Basel / CH
[2019/03]
Inventor(s)01 / STÜBINGER, Stefan
Im Kirschgarten 35b
4102 Binningen BL / CH
02 / ZILLIG, Timo
Pappelnweg 28B
4310 Rheinfelden AG / CH
 [2019/03]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2019/03]
Application number, filing date17709112.110.03.2017
[2019/03]
WO2017EP55640
Priority number, dateEP2016015995311.03.2016         Original published format: EP 16159953
[2019/03]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017153560
Date:14.09.2017
Language:DE
[2017/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3426173
Date:16.01.2019
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2017
[2019/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.09.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/68, A61F2/30
[2019/03]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/03]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM BEREITSTELLEN VON TEILELEMENTEN EINES MEHRTEILIGEN IMPLANTATS ODER EINER MEHRTEILIGEN OSTEOSYNTHESE[2019/03]
English:METHOD FOR PROVIDING SUB-ELEMENTS OF A MULTIPART IMPLANT OR A MULTIPART OSTEOSYNTHESIS[2019/03]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE SOUS-ÉLÉMENTS D'UN IMPLANT MULTIPLE OU D'UNE OSTÉOSYNTHÈSE MULTIPLE[2019/03]
Entry into regional phase13.09.2018National basic fee paid 
13.09.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
13.09.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.09.2018Examination requested  [2019/03]
13.09.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
25.04.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2012330427  (YAREMCHUK MICHAEL J [US]) [X] 1,4-6,8,10,11 * figures 11A-11D * [I] 2,3,12-15;
 [XI]US2013289727  (RUDNICK JAMES J [US], et al) [X] 1,4-6,8,10,11 * paragraph [0043] * [I] 2,3,12-15;
 [A]US2015088142  (GIBSON LUKE ANDREW [US]) [A] 1-15 * figure 26 *
by applicantUS6060641
 US2015018829
 WO2008051967
 US2012330427
 US2013289727