blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3426173 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3426173



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 191
25.04.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
25.04.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
25.04.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
25.04.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
25.04.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
19.12.2018 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
18.10.2018 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
16.10.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
16.10.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.10.2018 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 4
26.09.2018 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
13.09.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
13.09.2018 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
18.07.2018 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
02.10.2017 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 31
14.09.2017 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
14.09.2017 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
14.09.2017 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 31
02.06.2017 ISR: cited documents (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
02.06.2017 International Search Report - copy in English for the IB International Searching Authority 2
01.06.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
01.06.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
01.06.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
03.05.2017 Incoming letter related to ISA procedure International Searching Authority 1
27.04.2017 Incoming letter related to ISA procedure International Searching Authority 1
20.03.2017 Notification of receipt of Search copy (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
17.03.2017 Notification of the international application number and of the international filing date PCT receiving Office 5
14.03.2017 Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) International Searching Authority 1
10.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
10.03.2017 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
10.03.2017 Claims PCT receiving Office 3
10.03.2017 Description PCT receiving Office 19
10.03.2017 Document concerning fees and payments PCT receiving Office 2
10.03.2017 Drawings PCT receiving Office 7
10.03.2017 Electronic request for grant of an International application PCT receiving Office 4
10.03.2017 Priority document (RO-procedure) PCT receiving Office 30