blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3426173


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
17.05.2019 Change: Validation states published on  19.06.2019  [2019/25]
17.05.2019 Change - extension states published on  19.06.2019  [2019/25]
26.04.2019 Amendment by applicant
10.04.2019 Request for examination filed published on  16.01.2019  [2019/03]
30.03.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.12.2018 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  16.01.2019  [2019/03]
14.12.2018 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible has been established
14.12.2018 Request for examination filed published on  16.01.2019  [2019/03]
21.11.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
17.09.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
14.09.2018 Change - representative
14.09.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
02.10.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
15.09.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
15.03.2017 PCT data prior to European publication