Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3463949

EP3463949 - OUTER SKIN MODULE OF A VEHICLE DOOR AND VEHICLE DOOR HAVING SUCH AN OUTER SKIN MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  22.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
26.07.2019Change - extension statespublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft
Petuelring 130
80809 München / DE
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / SOLDNER, Florian
Brandlweg 5A
83098 Brannenburg / DE
02 / VALLERIUS, Markus
Nymphenburger Strasse 62
80335 München / DE
 [2019/15]
Application number, filing date17710533.513.03.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017EP55833
Priority number, dateDE20161020914825.05.2016         Original published format: DE102016209148
[2019/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017202516
Date:30.11.2017
Language:DE
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3463949
Date:10.04.2019
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:B60J5/04
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:AUSSENHAUTMODUL EINER FAHRZEUGTÜR SOWIE FAHRZEUGTÜR MIT EINEM SOLCHEN AUSSENHAUTMODUL[2019/15]
English:OUTER SKIN MODULE OF A VEHICLE DOOR AND VEHICLE DOOR HAVING SUCH AN OUTER SKIN MODULE[2019/15]
French:MODULE DE PEAU EXTÉRIEURE D'UNE PORTE DE VÉHICULE ET PORTE DE VÉHICULE DOTÉE D'UN TEL MODULE DE PEAU EXTÉRIEURE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase30.10.2018National basic fee paid 
30.10.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
30.10.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.10.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
30.10.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
15.04.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201903   M06   Fee paid on   23.05.2019
Cited inInternational search[XYI]US2010229470  (WIKSTROM LARS [SE]) [X] 1-4,8,11 * paragraphs [0011] - [0018] * * figures 1,2,6 * [Y] 1,5-7 [I] 9-13;
 [Y]EP1688287  (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [Y] 1,5-7 * paragraphs [0005] - [0012] * * figures 1,2 *;
 [XI]US2009224571  (HUTTSELL BENJAMIN [US] ET AL) [X] 1,2,4 * paragraphs [0050] - [0055] * * figures 1,2 * [I] 3,8-13