Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3430292

EP3430292 - SEAL ARRANGEMENT FOR SEALING A GAP [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  21.12.2018
Database last updated on 20.08.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  22.09.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  27.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 26.06.2019  [2019/26]
24.05.2019Change - extension statespublished on 26.06.2019  [2019/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GEA Mechanical Equipment GmbH
Werner-Habig-Strasse 1
59302 Oelde / DE
[2019/04]
Inventor(s)01 / MACKEL, Wilfried
Heienkamp 13
59510 Lippetal-Herzfeld / DE
02 / KLEIMANN, Thomas
Von-Brachum-Str. 15
59302 Oelde / DE
 [2019/04]
Representative(s)Specht, Peter
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2019/04]
Application number, filing date17711146.515.03.2017
[2019/04]
WO2017EP56171
Priority number, dateDE20161010504718.03.2016         Original published format: DE102016105047
[2019/04]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017158057
Date:21.09.2017
Language:DE
[2017/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3430292
Date:23.01.2019
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2017
[2019/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.09.2017
ClassificationInternational:F16J15/02, F16J15/06, F16J15/10
[2019/04]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/04]
TitleGerman:DICHTUNGSANORDNUNG ZUR ABDICHTUNG EINES SPALTES[2019/04]
English:SEAL ARRANGEMENT FOR SEALING A GAP[2019/04]
French:ENSEMBLE D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ POUR L'ÉTANCHÉIFICATION D'UNE FENTE[2019/04]
Entry into regional phase10.10.2018National basic fee paid 
10.10.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
10.10.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.10.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.10.2018Examination requested  [2019/04]
10.10.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[AD]DE102011081973  (FEDERAL MOGUL SEALING SYS SPA [DE]) [AD] 1-7 * paragraphs [0029] - [0034] - [0037] - [0038] * * figures 1, 4 *;
 [A]DE3815511  (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 1-7 * column 2, lines 27-50 * * figures 2, 3 *;
 [A]JP2013044379  (MIKUNI KOGYO KK) [A] 1-7 * figures 3, 4, 6, 7, 9 *
by applicantDE102011081973