Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3426212

EP3426212 - COMPOSITIONED, TEXTURED NONWOVEN WEBS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  25.06.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  14.12.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  15.09.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  27.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.11.2019New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[2019/03]
Inventor(s)01 / ROSATI, Rodrigo
Procter&Gamble Service GmbH
Sulzbacher Strasse 40
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
02 / ORR, Jill, Marlene
One Procter&Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati Ohio 45202 / US
03 / HAMMONS, John, Lee
One Procter&Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati Ohio 45202 / US
04 / STRUBE, John, Brian
One Procter&Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati Ohio 45202 / US
05 / POONDRU, Shirdish
One Procter&Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati Ohio 45202 / US
 [2019/03]
Representative(s)Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/03]Briatore, Andrea
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
IP Department
Sulzbacher Straße 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
Application number, filing date17711549.009.03.2017
[2019/03]
WO2017US21485
Priority number, dateUS201662306730P11.03.2016         Original published format: US 201662306730 P
[2019/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017156209
Date:14.09.2017
Language:EN
[2017/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3426212
Date:16.01.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2017
[2019/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.09.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/511, A61F13/512, A61F13/513, A61F13/537, B32B5/26, D04H1/70
[2019/03]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/03]
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENGESETZTE, TEXTURIERTE VLIESSTOFFBAHNEN[2019/03]
English:COMPOSITIONED, TEXTURED NONWOVEN WEBS[2019/03]
French:BANDES NON TISSÉES TEXTURÉES AVEC DES COMPOSITIONS[2019/03]
Entry into regional phase13.08.2018National basic fee paid 
13.08.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
13.08.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.08.2018Examination requested  [2019/03]
13.08.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
28.03.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.07.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.11.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.11.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2016067118  (HAMMONS JOHN LEE [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs 45,49-58, 66-67 - pages 2a,2b, 2 * [Y] 5-15;
 [Y]US2010247844  (CURRO JOHN JOSEPH [US], et al) [Y] 5-15 * paragraphs [0020] - [0022] - [0058] , [0062] , [0088] - [0092] *;
 [Y]US2011302733  (YUAN JAMES [US]) [Y] 5-15 * paragraphs [0022] , [0025] - [0026] *;
 [A]US2007049153  (DUNBAR CHARLENE H [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0006] , [0066] , [0068]; figure 1 *;
 [Y]EP1338262  (KAO CORP [JP]) [Y] 5-15 * paragraphs [0009] , [0011] , [0018] - [0020] - [0029] - [0030] *
by applicantUS2016074256
 US2016278986
 US2003206943
 US2007219515
 WO2013122932
 WO02076423
 US6159485
 US5939082
 US5686082
 US5686367
 US4976953
 US5972806
 US5599335
 EP1447066
 WO9511652
 US2008312622
 WO2012052172
 US2014163500
 US2014163506
 US2014163511
 US4573986
 US3911173
 US4785996
 US4842666
 US3860003
 US5221274
 US5554145
 US5569234
 US5580411
 US6004306
 WO0059430
 WO9510996
 US5700254
 WO02067809
 US20030405456