Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3426212 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3426212



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 567
21.11.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
21.11.2019 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
01.11.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
01.11.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
01.11.2019 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 1
01.11.2019 Claims Search / examination 2
01.11.2019 Description Search / examination 1
01.11.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
01.11.2019 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
02.07.2019 Annex to a communication Search / examination 18
02.07.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
02.07.2019 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
28.03.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
28.03.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
28.03.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
28.03.2019 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
28.03.2019 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
28.03.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
28.03.2019 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
28.03.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
18.03.2019 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
15.03.2019 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
28.02.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.02.2019 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
19.12.2018 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
18.10.2018 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
16.10.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
16.10.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
16.10.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
16.10.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
16.10.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
26.09.2018 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
13.08.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.08.2018 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
18.07.2018 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
02.10.2017 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 167
14.09.2017 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
14.09.2017 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 147
18.05.2017 ISR: cited documents (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
17.05.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
17.05.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
17.05.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
30.03.2017 Notification of receipt of Search copy (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
17.03.2017 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
17.03.2017 Annex International Searching Authority 3
17.03.2017 Claims International Searching Authority 3
17.03.2017 Description International Searching Authority 99
17.03.2017 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 1
17.03.2017 Drawings International Searching Authority 44
17.03.2017 Fee calculation sheet for an international application International Searching Authority 2
17.03.2017 Notification Concerning Payment of Prescribed Fees (copy for ISA/EP) International Searching Authority 2
17.03.2017 Notification of the International Application Number and of the International Filing Date (copy for ISA/EP) International Searching Authority 1
17.03.2017 Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) International Searching Authority 5