Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3426212


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
18.11.2019 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
06.11.2019 New entry: Reply to examination report
28.06.2019 First examination report
25.06.2019 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
17.05.2019 Change: Validation states published on  19.06.2019  [2019/25]
17.05.2019 Change - extension states published on  19.06.2019  [2019/25]
10.04.2019 Request for examination filed published on  16.01.2019  [2019/03]
05.04.2019 Amendment by applicant
25.03.2019 Change - representative
16.03.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.03.2019 Change - representative
14.12.2018 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  16.01.2019  [2019/03]
14.12.2018 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
14.12.2018 Request for examination filed published on  16.01.2019  [2019/03]
21.11.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
14.09.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
24.08.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
13.08.2018 Change - representative
13.08.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
29.09.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
15.09.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
27.03.2017 PCT data prior to European publication