Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3422954

EP3422954 - CORNEAL MEASUREMENT AND CONTROL OF CORNEAL CROSSLINKING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.11.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  07.12.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.09.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  29.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.11.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Teclens, LLC
175 Harbor Road
St. James, NY 11780 / US
[2019/02]
Inventor(s)01 / LOPATH, Patrick David
83 Ledge Lane
Stamford, CT 06905 / US
 [2019/02]
Representative(s)Clark, Jane Anne , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[2019/02]
Application number, filing date17712278.528.02.2017
[2019/02]
WO2017US19969
Priority number, dateUS201662301040P29.02.2016         Original published format: US 201662301040 P
[2019/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017151630
Date:08.09.2017
Language:EN
[2017/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3422954
Date:09.01.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.2017
[2019/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.09.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61B8/08, A61N5/06, A61F9/007, A61F9/008
[2019/02]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/02]
TitleGerman:HORNHAUTMESSUNG UND KONTROLLE DER HORNHAUTVERNETZUNG[2019/02]
English:CORNEAL MEASUREMENT AND CONTROL OF CORNEAL CROSSLINKING[2019/02]
French:MESURE CORNÉENNE ET CONTRÔLE DE RÉTICULATION CORNÉENNE[2019/02]
Entry into regional phase28.09.2018National basic fee paid 
28.09.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
28.09.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.12.2017Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.09.2018Examination requested  [2019/02]
28.09.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
11.11.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XDAYI]WO2015200817  (TECLENS LLC [US]) [XD] 1-3,7-9 * paragraphs [0016] , [0017] , [0026] - [0030]; figure 1 * [A] 12-14 [Y] 4-6 [I] 10,11;
 [Y]WO2009124271  (ARCSCAN INC [US], et al) [Y] 4-6 * claims 10,12,17 *;
 [A]  - MORAMARCO ANTONIO ET AL, "Corneal stromal demarcation line after accelerated crosslinking using continuous and pulsed light", JOURNAL CATARACT AND REFRACTIVE SURGERY, (20151101), vol. 41, no. 11, doi:10.1016/J.JCRS.2015.04.033, ISSN 0886-3350, pages 2546 - 2551, XP029357225 [A] 12-14 * columns 6-9 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jcrs.2015.04.033
by applicantUS2014379054
 WO2015200817
 WO2016106217
    - ACKA; ACKA ET AL., "Observation of sound-induced corneal vibrational modes by Optical coherence tomography", BIOMEDICAL OPTICS EXPRESS, (2015), vol. 6, no. 9, doi:doi:10.1364/BOE.6.003313, pages 3313 - 3319, XP055269094

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/BOE.6.003313