Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3422954


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
15.02.2020 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.11.2019 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
03.05.2019 Change: Validation states published on  05.06.2019  [2019/23]
03.05.2019 Change - extension states published on  05.06.2019  [2019/23]
10.04.2019 Request for examination filed published on  09.01.2019  [2019/02]
16.02.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.12.2018 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  09.01.2019  [2019/02]
07.12.2018 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
07.12.2018 Request for examination filed published on  09.01.2019  [2019/02]
09.11.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
02.11.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
09.10.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
29.09.2018 Change - representative
29.09.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
02.03.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
26.09.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
08.09.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
29.03.2017 PCT data prior to European publication