Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468938

EP3468938 - SPINEL REFRACTORY GRANULATES WHICH ARE SUITABLE FOR ELASTICIZING HEAVY-CLAY REFRACTORY PRODUCTS, METHOD FOR THEIR PRODUCTION AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  25.11.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  04.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
26.07.2019Change - extension statespublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Refratechnik Holding GmbH
Adalperostrasse 82
85737 Ismaning / DE
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / LIEVER, Heinrich
In der Tweer 9
37127 Dransfeld / DE
02 / SCHULZE-BERGKAMEN, Hilmar
748 Redoubt Road
Flat Bush
Auckland 2016 / NZ
03 / VELLMER, Carsten
Böttingerstrasse 2A
37073 Göttingen / DE
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf
Candidplatz 15
81543 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17713279.223.03.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017EP56998
Priority number, dateDE20161010925419.05.2016         Original published format: DE102016109254
[2019/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017198377
Date:23.11.2017
Language:DE
[2017/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468938
Date:17.04.2019
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.11.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:C04B35/10, C04B35/101, C04B35/443, C04B35/626, C04B35/64, C04B35/66, F27D1/00
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:ZUR ELASTIFIZIERUNG VON GROBKERAMISCHEN FEUERFESTERZEUGNISSEN GEEIGNETE FEUERFESTE SPINELLGRANULATE, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND IHRE VERWENDUNG[2019/16]
English:SPINEL REFRACTORY GRANULATES WHICH ARE SUITABLE FOR ELASTICIZING HEAVY-CLAY REFRACTORY PRODUCTS, METHOD FOR THEIR PRODUCTION AND USE THEREOF[2019/16]
French:GRANULATS DE SPINELLE IGNIFUGES CONVENANT POUR RENDRE ÉLASTIQUES DES PRODUITS IGNIFUGES EN CÉRAMIQUE GROSSIÈRE, PROCÉDÉ POUR LES RÉALISER ET LEUR UTILISATION[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase18.12.2018National basic fee paid 
18.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
18.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
18.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
24.04.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[I]EP1247785  (REFRATECHNIK HOLDING GMBH [DE]) [I] 1-13 * Absatz [0022];; figure 3; examples 1,2; claims 1,8,10,19 *;
 [A]CN101973771  (ZIBO CITY LUZHONG REFRACTORY CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-13 * Zusammenfassung; "Embodiments 2,4";; claims 1-3 *;
 [AD]  - W. KWESTROO, "Spinel Phase in the System MgO-Fe2O3-Al2O3", J. INORG. NUCL. CHEM., NL, (19590101), vol. 9, pages 65 - 70, XP009058974 [AD] 1-13 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-1902(59)80012-9
by applicantDE3527789
 DE4403869
 DE10117026
 DE10117026
 CN101823872
 DE10117029
 DE4403869
    - KLISCHAT ET AL., "Smart refractory solution for stress-loaded rotary kilns", ZKG, (2013), vol. 66, pages 54 - 60, XP001586306
    - W. KWESTROO, J. INORG. NUCL. CHEM., (1959), vol. 9, pages 65 - 70