Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3435869

EP3435869 - CONDUCTIVE SUPPORT MEMBER FOR INTRAVASCULAR IMAGING DEVICE AND ASSOCIATED DEVICES, SYSTEMS, AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  04.01.2019
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  07.10.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  10.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.10.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[2019/06]
Inventor(s)01 / WROLSTAD, David Kenneth
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
02 / MINAS, Maritess
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
03 / SAROHA, Princeton
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
04 / STIGALL, Jeremy
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
 [2019/06]
Representative(s)Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2019/06]Steffen, Thomas
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date17714458.130.03.2017
[2019/06]
WO2017EP57558
Priority number, dateUS201662315421P30.03.2016         Original published format: US 201662315421 P
[2019/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017167886
Date:05.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3435869
Date:06.02.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.2017
[2019/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.10.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61B8/00, A61B8/12, A61B8/08
[2019/06]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/06]
TitleGerman:LEITFÄHIGES TRÄGERELEMENT FÜR VORRICHTUNG ZUR INTRAVASKULÄREN BILDGEBUNG UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VORRICHTUNGEN, SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN[2019/06]
English:CONDUCTIVE SUPPORT MEMBER FOR INTRAVASCULAR IMAGING DEVICE AND ASSOCIATED DEVICES, SYSTEMS, AND METHODS[2019/06]
French:ÉLÉMENT DE SUPPORT CONDUCTEUR POUR DISPOSITIF D'IMAGERIE INTRAVASCULAIRE ET DISPOSITIFS, SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS[2019/06]
Entry into regional phase30.10.2018National basic fee paid 
30.10.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
30.10.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.10.2018Examination requested  [2019/06]
30.10.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
13.03.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2015305710  (STIGALL JEREMY [US] ET AL) [X] 1,4-6,13,15 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0043]; figure -; claim - * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0033] * [I] 2,3,7-12,14,16-20;
 [XI]US2015305716  (RICE CHERYL D [US] ET AL) [X] 1,5,6,15 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0010]; figure -; claim - * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0045] * [I] 2-4,7-14,16-20;
 [XI]US2016081657  (RICE CHERYL D [US]) [X] 1,5,6,15 * paragraph [0002]; figure -; claim - * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0050] * [I] 2-4,7-14,16-20;
 [XI]US2014187960  (CORL PAUL DOUGLAS [US]) [X] 1,5,6,15 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0084] * * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0086] * * paragraph [0093] - paragraph [0094] * [I] 2-4,7-14,16-20;
 [XI]WO9723865  (ENDOSONICS CORP [US]) [X] 1,5,6,15 * page 1, lines 1-10; figure -; claim - * * page 6, line 1 - page 7, line 18; figure -; claim - * * page 9, line 3 - page 17, line 20; figure -; claim - * [I] 2-4,7-14,16-20
by applicantUS7846101
 US6641540
 US6776763
 US7226417