Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468461

EP3468461 - AORTIC ANEURYSM PROGRESSION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  10.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip19.08.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Oxford University Innovation Limited
Buxton Court
3 West Way
Oxford, Oxfordshire OX2 0JB / GB
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / LEE, Regent
c/o Oxford University Innovation Limited
Buxton Court
3 West Way
Botley Oxford OX2 0JB / GB
02 / HANDA, Ashok
c/o Oxford University Innovation Limited
Buxton Court
3 West Way
Botley Oxford OX2 0JB / GB
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
1 City Walk
Leeds LS11 9DX / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17714532.322.03.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017GB50811
Priority number, dateGB2016001004008.06.2016         Original published format: GB 201610040
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017212210
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468461
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/02, G06F19/00, A61B5/00
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:AORTENANEURYSMAPROGRESSION[2019/16]
English:AORTIC ANEURYSM PROGRESSION[2019/16]
French:PROGRESSION D'ANÉVRISME AORTIQUE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase19.12.2018National basic fee paid 
19.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
19.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
19.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
14.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[I]  - SUNG SHIH-HSIEN ET AL, "Reduced number and impaired function of circulating endothelial progenitor cells in patients with abdominal aortic aneurysm", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF CARDIOLOGY, (20121122), vol. 168, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.IJCARD.2012.11.002, ISSN 0167-5273, pages 1070 - 1077, XP028740522 [I] 1-36 * 1 Introduction * * 3.2 Factors associated with maximal AAA diameter;; figure 2A * * 4.1 Endothelial and vascular damage in AAA *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ijcard.2012.11.002
 [I]  - TATSUYA MARUHASHI ET AL, "Relationship between flow-mediated vasodilation and cardiovascular risk factors in a large community-based study", HEART, GB, (20131023), vol. 99, no. 24, doi:10.1136/heartjnl-2013-304739, ISSN 1355-6037, pages 1837 - 1842, XP055369546 [I] 1-36 * Statistical analysis * * DISCUSSION * * Key messages * * figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1136/heartjnl-2013-304739
 [I]  - MEDINA F ET AL, "Relationship Between Endothelial Dependent Vasodilation and Size of Abdominal Aortic Aneurysms", ANNALS OF VASCULAR SURGERY, QUALITY MEDICAL PUBLISHING, ST. LOUIS, MO, US, vol. 24, no. 6, ISSN 0890-5096, (20100801), pages 752 - 757, (20100729), XP027382143 [I] 1-36 * DISCUSSION * * figures 1,2 *
 [A]  - Tim Kenny ET AL, "Abdominal Aortic Aneurysm", (20150708), pages 1 - 5, URL: https://medical.azureedge.net/pdf/4560.pdf?v=636259732788740676, (20170504), XP055369441 [A] 1-36 * the whole document *
 [T]  - R. LEE ET AL, "Flow Mediated Dilatation and Progression of Abdominal Aortic Aneurysms", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF VASCULAR AND ENDOVASCULAR SURGERY, GB, (20170401), doi:10.1016/j.ejvs.2017.03.001, ISSN 1078-5884, pages 1 - 10, XP055368920 [T] 1-36 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ejvs.2017.03.001