Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3439528

EP3439528 - SLIDING AND LIFTING MECHANISM FOR A PIECE OF FURNITURE OR DOMESTIC APPLIANCE, AND PIECE OF FURNITURE OR DOMESTIC APPLIANCE HAVING SUCH A SLIDING AND LIFTING MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  11.09.2019
Database last updated on 18.11.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  11.01.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  13.10.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  18.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Change - inventorpublished on 18.12.2019 [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Paul Hettich GmbH & Co. KG
Vahrenkampstraße 12-16
32278 Kirchlengern / DE
For all designated states
BSH Hausgeräte GmbH
Carl-Wery-Strasse 34
81739 München / DE
[2019/07]
Inventor(s)01 / REHAGE, Daniel
Wilhelm-Hauff-Weg 11
09127 Chemnitz / DE
02 / BRINKMAN, Rüdiger
Borlefzener Kirchweg 52
32602 Vlotho / DE
03 / WROBEL, Jana
Hohenhof 4
27432 Bremervörde / DE
04 / KRÜGER, David
Albert-Rusch-Str. 42
32545 Bad Oeynhausen / DE
05 / GURR, Arnold
Natruper Str. 90
49090 Osnabrück / DE
06 / BEXTERMÖLLER, Benjamin
Felsenkellerweg 24
49324 Melle / DE
07 / RACS, Florian
Leintalstr. 66
89522 Heidenheim/Brenz / DE
08 / STECK, Thomas
St.-Stephanus-Str. 31a
89438 Holzheim / DE
09 / HEINLE, Martin
Hauptstrasse 2
89353 Glött / DE
[2019/51]
Former [2019/07]01 / REHAGE, Daniele
Wilhelm-Hauff Weg 11
09137 Chemnitz / DE
02 / BRINKMAN, Rüdiger
Borlefzener Kirchweg 52
32602 Vlotho / DE
03 / WROBEL, Jana
Hohenhof 4
27432 Bremervörde / DE
04 / KRÜGER, David
Albert-Rusch-Str. 42
32545 Bad Oeynhausen / DE
05 / GURR, Arnold
Natruper Str. 90
49090 Osnabrück / DE
06 / BEXTERMÖLLER, Benjamin
Felsenkellerweg 24
49324 Melle / DE
07 / RACS, Florian
Leintalstr. 66
89522 Heidenheim/Brenz / DE
08 / STECK, Thomas
St.-Stephanus-Str. 31a
89438 Holzheim / DE
09 / HEINLE, Martin
Hauptstrasse 2
89353 Glött / DE
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2019/07]
Application number, filing date17715955.507.04.2017
[2019/07]
WO2017EP58424
Priority number, dateDE20161010652808.04.2016         Original published format: DE102016106528
[2019/07]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017174793
Date:12.10.2017
Language:DE
[2017/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3439528
Date:13.02.2019
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.10.2017
[2019/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.10.2017
ClassificationInternational:A47L15/50
[2019/07]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/07]
TitleGerman:SCHIEBE- UND HUBMECHANISMUS FÜR EIN MÖBEL ODER HAUSHALTSGERÄT UND MÖBEL ODER HAUSHALTSGERÄT MIT EINEM DERARTIGEN SCHIEBE- UND HUBMECHANISMUS[2019/07]
English:SLIDING AND LIFTING MECHANISM FOR A PIECE OF FURNITURE OR DOMESTIC APPLIANCE, AND PIECE OF FURNITURE OR DOMESTIC APPLIANCE HAVING SUCH A SLIDING AND LIFTING MECHANISM[2019/07]
French:MÉCANISME DE POUSSÉE ET DE LEVÉE POUR UN MEUBLE OU UN APPAREIL ÉLECTROMÉNAGER ET MEUBLE OU APPAREIL ÉLECTROMÉNAGER COMPORTANT UN TEL MÉCANISME DE POUSSÉE ET DE LEVÉE[2019/07]
Entry into regional phase30.10.2018National basic fee paid 
30.10.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
30.10.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.10.2018Examination requested  [2019/07]
30.10.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
22.05.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.09.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[AD]DE102012107993  (HETTICH PAUL GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [AD] 1-17 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0053] *;
 [A]WO2015185631  (BSH HAUSGERÄTE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-17 * page 1, line 25 - page 7, line 23 *;
 [A]US5115822  (NICHOLS WILL E [US]) [A] 1-17 * column 3, line 53 - column 4, line 52 *
by applicantJP2006204591
 DE102012107993