Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3439528 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3439528



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 282
13.11.2019 Change to the inventor details Search / examination 1
07.11.2019 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
12.09.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
12.09.2019 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
12.09.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
12.09.2019 Text intended for grant Search / examination 34
12.09.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 34
31.07.2019 Examination started Search / examination 1
11.07.2019 Statement of non-availability of priority search results Search / examination 1
01.07.2019 Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) Search / examination 1
22.05.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
22.05.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
22.05.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
22.05.2019 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
22.05.2019 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
22.05.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
22.05.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
16.01.2019 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
16.11.2018 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
13.11.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
13.11.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
13.11.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
13.11.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
13.11.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
13.11.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
13.11.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
13.11.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
13.11.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
30.10.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
30.10.2018 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
24.10.2018 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
20.08.2018 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
30.10.2017 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 38
12.10.2017 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
12.10.2017 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
12.10.2017 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 36
20.06.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
20.06.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
20.06.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
08.06.2017 Notification of the recording of a change PCT receiving Office 1
08.06.2017 Notification of the recording of a change PCT receiving Office 1
23.05.2017 Notification of the recording of a change PCT receiving Office 1
23.05.2017 Notification of the recording of a change International Searching Authority 1
23.05.2017 Notification of the recording of a change PCT receiving Office 1
23.05.2017 Notification of the recording of a change International Searching Authority 1
23.05.2017 Notification of the recording of a change International Searching Authority 1
23.05.2017 Notification of the recording of a change PCT receiving Office 1
23.05.2017 Notification of the recording of a change PCT receiving Office 1
23.05.2017 Notification of the recording of a change PCT receiving Office 1
23.05.2017 Notification of the recording of a change International Searching Authority 1
23.05.2017 Notification of the recording of a change International Searching Authority 1
23.05.2017 Notification of the recording of a change International Searching Authority 1
23.05.2017 Notification of the recording of a change International Searching Authority 1
23.05.2017 Notification of the recording of a change PCT receiving Office 1
23.05.2017 Notification of the recording of a change PCT receiving Office 1
23.05.2017 Notification of the recording of a change International Searching Authority 1
23.05.2017 Notification of the recording of a change International Searching Authority 1
23.05.2017 Notification of the recording of a change PCT receiving Office 1
23.05.2017 Notification of the recording of a change PCT receiving Office 1
22.05.2017 Incoming fax related to PCT RO PCT receiving Office 3
10.05.2017 Incoming letter related to PCT RO PCT receiving Office 2
18.04.2017 Notification of the international application number and of the international filing date PCT receiving Office 5
07.04.2017 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
07.04.2017 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
07.04.2017 Claims PCT receiving Office 3
07.04.2017 Description PCT receiving Office 18
07.04.2017 Document concerning fees and payments PCT receiving Office 2
07.04.2017 Drawings PCT receiving Office 13
07.04.2017 Electronic request for grant of an International application PCT receiving Office 4