Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3439528


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
15.11.2019 Change - inventor published on  18.12.2019 [2019/51]
11.09.2019 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
14.06.2019 Change: Validation states published on  17.07.2019  [2019/29]
14.06.2019 Change - extension states published on  17.07.2019  [2019/29]
24.05.2019 Amendment by applicant
15.04.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.04.2019 Request for examination filed published on  13.02.2019  [2019/07]
11.01.2019 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  13.02.2019  [2019/07]
11.01.2019 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
11.01.2019 Request for examination filed published on  13.02.2019  [2019/07]
19.12.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
02.11.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
30.10.2018 Change - representative
30.10.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
03.11.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
13.10.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
18.04.2017 PCT data prior to European publication