Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3419506

EP3419506 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR REAL TIME TELEMONITORING OF CARDIAC ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  30.11.2018
Database last updated on 14.07.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.09.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  21.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.04.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 29.05.2019  [2019/22]
26.04.2019Change - extension statespublished on 29.05.2019  [2019/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
"Check Point R and D", Limited Liability Company
5A "Kliment Ohridski" Street
Office 607
3400 Montana / BG
[2019/01]
Inventor(s)01 / KOLEV, Ventsislav Nikolaev
27 Pop Gruyu Street
3th floor - left
8001 Burgas / BG
02 / BOROV, Stoyan Petkov
j.k. Lazur
bl.16, entr.2
1st floor
8001 Burgas / BG
03 / DIMITROV, Boris Angelov
Area Golyamata Gora3
6100 Kazanluk / BG
04 / PEEV, Radoslav Peev
58 "San Stefano" Blvd.
Entr.2
3rd floor
Ap.4
8001 Burgas / BG
05 / BOYCHEV, Boycho Dentchev
4 Lyubomir Kabakchiev Street
Entr. B
Ap.33
6100 Kazanluk / BG
06 / DACHOV, Ivaylo Zlatkov
35 Akademik Boris Stefanov" Street
Entr. B
1st floor
1700 Sofia / BG
 [2019/01]
Representative(s)Manev, Kostadin Chanev
Manev & Partners
73, Patriarh Evtimii Blvd., floor 1
1463 Sofia / BG
[2019/01]
Application number, filing date17716442.320.02.2017
[2019/01]
WO2017BG00002
Priority number, dateBG2016011221923.02.2016         Original published format: BG 11221916
[2019/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017143411
Date:31.08.2017
Language:EN
[2017/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3419506
Date:02.01.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.08.2017
[2019/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP31.08.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/00, A61B7/04, A61B5/04, A61B5/0408
[2019/01]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/01]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR ECHTZEIT-FERNÜBERWACHUNG DER HERZAKTIVITÄT[2019/01]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR REAL TIME TELEMONITORING OF CARDIAC ACTIVITY[2019/01]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE TÉLÉSURVEILLANCE EN TEMPS RÉEL D'ACTIVITÉ CARDIAQUE[2019/01]
Entry into regional phase18.09.2018National basic fee paid 
18.09.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
18.09.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.09.2018Examination requested  [2019/01]
18.09.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
25.03.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2003083582  (HIRSH ROBERT [US]) [Y] 1 * paragraphs [0119] , [0129] , [0162] *;
 [Y]US4928690  (HEILMAN MARLIN S [US], et al) [Y] 1 * column 5, line 19 - line 35 * * column 6, line 60 - column 7, line 2 * * column 7, line 43 - column 8, line 10; claim 17 *;
 [Y]US2012101396  (SOLOSKO THOMAS [US], et al) [Y] 2-4 * paragraphs [0008] , [0050] , [0056] , [0068]; figure 14 *;
 [Y]US2015005588  (HERKEN ULRICH [US], et al) [Y] 2-4 * paragraph [0055]; figure 4 *;
 [Y]WO2014206382  (KRANZ VLADIMIR [CZ]) [Y] 2-4 * page 40, last paragraph - page 41, line 5 * * page 43, second paragraph * * page 55, last paragraph *;; claims 9,10 *;
 [A]DE202005020525U  (OESTREICH WOLFGANG [DE]) [A] 1-4 * paragraph [0032] *;
 [A]US2012136231  (MARKEL GAL [IL]) [A] 1-4 * paragraphs [0116] , [0237] *;
 [A]US6856832  (MATSUMURA FUMIYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * figure 1 *