Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472120

EP3472120 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR ON-LINE BLENDING OF FOAMING AGENT WITH FOAM MODIFIER FOR ADDITION TO CEMENTITIOUS SLURRIES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  21.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019  [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019  [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
United States Gypsum Company
550 West Adams Street
Chicago, IL 60661-3676 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / VILINSKA, Annamaria
5036 W. Pensacola 203
Chicago Illinois 60641 / US
02 / LI, Alfred C.
716 Knoch Knolls Road
Naperville Illinois 60565 / US
03 / SONG, Weixin D.
1068 Huaihai Road Middle Building 2
Unit 7C
Shanghai 200031 / CN
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)BSB Patentanwälte Schütte & Engelen Partnerschaft mbB
Am Markt 10
59302 Oelde / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17716723.629.03.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017US24677
Priority number, dateUS20161518632017.06.2016         Original published format: US201615186320
US20161518633617.06.2016         Original published format: US201615186336
WO2016US3888523.06.2016         Original published format: PCT/US2016/038885
US20171543144413.02.2017         Original published format: US201715431444
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017218061
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472120
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C04B28/14, C04B28/04, C04B38/10, C04B24/02, B01F17/00, B01F15/04, B01F3/04, B28C7/04, B28C5/12, C04B103/48
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM ONLINE-MISCHEN VON SCHAUMMITTEL MIT SCHAUMMODIFIKATOR ZUR ZUGABE ZU ZEMENTGEBUNDENEN SCHLÄMMEN[2019/17]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR ON-LINE BLENDING OF FOAMING AGENT WITH FOAM MODIFIER FOR ADDITION TO CEMENTITIOUS SLURRIES[2019/17]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE MÉLANGE EN LIGNE D'AGENT MOUSSANT ET DE MODIFICATEUR DE MOUSSE POUR L'AJOUT À DES LAITIERS CIMENTAIRES[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase14.01.2019National basic fee paid 
14.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
14.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
14.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
07.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]DE3807250  (ANTHES INC [CA]) [Y] 1-6 * column 4, line 5 - line 24 * * column 6, line 44 - column 7, line 19; figure 1; claim - *;
 [Y]JP2006069815  (SANYO CHEMICAL IND LTD) [Y] 1-6 * the whole document *;
 [Y]FR2963002  (LAFARGE SA [FR]) [Y] 1-6 * page 5, lines 1-25 * * page 7, line 1 - page 8, line 37 *;
 [AD]US5643510  (SUCECH STEVEN W [US]) [AD] 1-6 * column 2, line 27 - column 3, line 33 * * column 4, line 36 - line 63; figure 2; example . *;
 [X]US2008202415  (MILLER DAVID PAUL [US], et al) [X] 7-9 * paragraphs [0039] - [0031] - [0056] , [0059]; figure 1A *;
 [X]US2010246312  (WELKER CHARLES D [US], et al) [X] 7-10 * paragraphs [0005] - [0009] - [0030] , [0032] , [0038] , [0039]; figures 1,2 *;
 [X]WO2008139439  (BEN LULU GILBERT GAL [IL]) [X] 7-10 * page 4, paragraph 3 - paragraph 4 * * page 5, paragraph 3 * * page 6, paragraph 3 - paragraph 6; figure 4 *
by applicantUS5643510
 US4518652
 US2080009
 US2017022
 US5683635
 US6494609
 US2007048490
 US3573947
 US6409825
 US2014113124
 US2015010767
 US6342284
 US6632550
 US6815049
 US6822033
 US7811685
 US8323785
 US7364676
 US2010247937
 US6874930
 US2012168527
 US2012170403
 US4203788
 US4488909
 US4504335
 US4916004
 US6869474
 US8070878