blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3595547

EP3595547 - WRAPPING CAPE SYSTEM FOR RETRIEVAL OF BLOCKING ITEMS IN TUBULAR ENVIRONMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.08.2023
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.09.2022
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.05.2022
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  11.06.2021
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  20.12.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  22.09.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  21.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.12.2023Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 10.01.2024  [2024/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gogousis, Vlasis
Flat 65 Ontario Point
28 Surrey Quays Road
SE16 7EE London / GB
For all designated states
Finitsis, Stefanos
16 Kerasountos Street
55131 Kalamaria Thessalonikis / GR
[2022/17]
Former [2020/04]For all designated states
GOGOUSSIS, Aristides
P.O.Box 120
55536 Pylaia Thessalonikis / GR
For all designated states
Finitsis, Stefanos
16 Kerasountos Street
55131 Kalamaria Thessalonikis / GR
Inventor(s)01 / GOGOUSSIS, Aristides, Prof.
P.O. Box 120
Pylaia
Thessaloniki 55536 / GR
02 / FINITSIS, Stefanos Prof.
16 Kerasountos Street
Thessaloniki 55131 / GR
03 / GOGOUSIS, Vlasis
Flat 65 Ontario Point
28 Surrey Quays Road
SE16 7EE, London / GB
 [2022/36]
Former [2020/04]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[2020/04]
Application number, filing date17716978.613.03.2017
[2020/04]
WO2017GR00011
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2018167521
Date:20.09.2018
Language:EN
[2018/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3595547
Date:22.01.2020
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2020/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3595547
Date:19.10.2022
Language:EN
[2022/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.09.2018
ClassificationIPC:A61B17/221
[2020/04]
CPC:
A61B17/221 (EP,US); A61B2017/00292 (US); A61B2017/00867 (US);
A61B2017/2212 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/04]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:UMHÜLLUNGSSYSTEM ZUM ZURÜCKHOLEN VON BLOCKIERENDEN GEGENSTÄNDEN IN ROHRFÖRMIGEN UMGEBUNGEN[2020/04]
English:WRAPPING CAPE SYSTEM FOR RETRIEVAL OF BLOCKING ITEMS IN TUBULAR ENVIRONMENTS[2020/04]
French:SYSTÈME DE CAPE D'ENVELOPPE POUR L'EXTRACTION D'ÉLÉMENTS BLOQUANTS DANS DES ENVIRONNEMENTS TUBULAIRES[2020/04]
Entry into regional phase06.09.2019National basic fee paid 
06.09.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
06.09.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.09.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.09.2019Examination requested  [2020/04]
06.09.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
01.06.2021Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01)
10.06.2021Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments
24.08.2021Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.12.2021Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.05.2022Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.09.2022Fee for grant paid
13.09.2022Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.09.2022Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)20.07.2023No opposition filed within time limit [2023/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
18.03.2020Renewal fee patent year 04
25.03.2021Renewal fee patent year 05
24.03.2022Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL19.10.2022
AT19.10.2022
CZ19.10.2022
DK19.10.2022
EE19.10.2022
ES19.10.2022
FI19.10.2022
HR19.10.2022
LT19.10.2022
LV19.10.2022
MC19.10.2022
PL19.10.2022
RO19.10.2022
RS19.10.2022
SE19.10.2022
SI19.10.2022
SK19.10.2022
SM19.10.2022
NO19.01.2023
IS19.02.2023
PT20.02.2023
LU13.03.2023
[2024/02]
Former [2023/51]AL19.10.2022
AT19.10.2022
CZ19.10.2022
DK19.10.2022
EE19.10.2022
ES19.10.2022
FI19.10.2022
HR19.10.2022
LT19.10.2022
LV19.10.2022
MC19.10.2022
PL19.10.2022
RO19.10.2022
RS19.10.2022
SE19.10.2022
SI19.10.2022
SK19.10.2022
SM19.10.2022
NO19.01.2023
IS19.02.2023
PT20.02.2023
Former [2023/48]AL19.10.2022
AT19.10.2022
CZ19.10.2022
DK19.10.2022
EE19.10.2022
ES19.10.2022
FI19.10.2022
HR19.10.2022
LT19.10.2022
LV19.10.2022
MC19.10.2022
PL19.10.2022
RO19.10.2022
RS19.10.2022
SE19.10.2022
SK19.10.2022
SM19.10.2022
NO19.01.2023
IS19.02.2023
PT20.02.2023
Former [2023/38]AL19.10.2022
AT19.10.2022
CZ19.10.2022
DK19.10.2022
EE19.10.2022
ES19.10.2022
FI19.10.2022
HR19.10.2022
LT19.10.2022
LV19.10.2022
PL19.10.2022
RO19.10.2022
RS19.10.2022
SE19.10.2022
SK19.10.2022
SM19.10.2022
NO19.01.2023
IS19.02.2023
PT20.02.2023
Former [2023/37]AL19.10.2022
AT19.10.2022
CZ19.10.2022
DK19.10.2022
EE19.10.2022
ES19.10.2022
FI19.10.2022
HR19.10.2022
LT19.10.2022
LV19.10.2022
PL19.10.2022
RO19.10.2022
RS19.10.2022
SE19.10.2022
SM19.10.2022
NO19.01.2023
IS19.02.2023
PT20.02.2023
Former [2023/35]AT19.10.2022
CZ19.10.2022
DK19.10.2022
EE19.10.2022
ES19.10.2022
FI19.10.2022
HR19.10.2022
LT19.10.2022
LV19.10.2022
PL19.10.2022
RO19.10.2022
RS19.10.2022
SE19.10.2022
SM19.10.2022
NO19.01.2023
IS19.02.2023
PT20.02.2023
Former [2023/34]AT19.10.2022
DK19.10.2022
EE19.10.2022
ES19.10.2022
FI19.10.2022
HR19.10.2022
LT19.10.2022
LV19.10.2022
PL19.10.2022
RS19.10.2022
SE19.10.2022
SM19.10.2022
NO19.01.2023
IS19.02.2023
PT20.02.2023
Former [2023/33]AT19.10.2022
DK19.10.2022
ES19.10.2022
FI19.10.2022
HR19.10.2022
LT19.10.2022
LV19.10.2022
PL19.10.2022
RS19.10.2022
SE19.10.2022
SM19.10.2022
NO19.01.2023
IS19.02.2023
PT20.02.2023
Former [2023/25]AT19.10.2022
ES19.10.2022
FI19.10.2022
HR19.10.2022
LT19.10.2022
LV19.10.2022
PL19.10.2022
RS19.10.2022
SE19.10.2022
NO19.01.2023
IS19.02.2023
PT20.02.2023
Former [2023/23]AT19.10.2022
ES19.10.2022
FI19.10.2022
LT19.10.2022
LV19.10.2022
SE19.10.2022
NO19.01.2023
PT20.02.2023
Former [2023/22]AT19.10.2022
ES19.10.2022
FI19.10.2022
LT19.10.2022
SE19.10.2022
NO19.01.2023
PT20.02.2023
Former [2023/20]LT19.10.2022
NO19.01.2023
Cited inInternational search[I]WO9302732  (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [I] 1-4 * page 5, line 18 - page 10, line 7; figures 1-3c *;
 [I]US7094249  (BROOME THOMAS E [US], et al) [I] 1-4 * column 10, line 43 - column 11, line 57; figures 22-24 *;
 [A]WO2011135556  (NEURAVI LTD [IE], et al) [A] 1-4* figures 15-17 *;
 [I]EP2486875  (COOK MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US]) [I] 1-4 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0044]; figures 1-5 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.