Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3435922

EP3435922 - MODULAR BONE MODEL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  04.01.2019
Database last updated on 19.08.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  07.10.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  21.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip31.05.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 03.07.2019  [2019/27]
31.05.2019Change - extension statespublished on 03.07.2019  [2019/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Biomet Manufacturing, LLC
56 East Bell Drive
Warsaw, IN 46582 / US
[2019/06]
Inventor(s)01 / WINSLOW, Nathan A.
2677 E Lake Tahoe Trail
Warsaw, Indiana 46582 / US
02 / KEHRES, Clinton E.
501 Barrington Place
Warsaw, Indiana 46582 / US
 [2019/06]
Representative(s)Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London, EC1A 4HD / GB
[2019/06]
Application number, filing date17717032.128.03.2017
[2019/06]
WO2017US24475
Priority number, dateUS201662314450P29.03.2016         Original published format: US 201662314450 P
[2019/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017172717
Date:05.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3435922
Date:06.02.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.2017
[2019/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.10.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/30, A61F2/40, A61F2/46, G09B23/30, G09B23/32, G09B23/34, A61B17/00
[2019/06]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/06]
TitleGerman:MODULARES KNOCHENMODELL[2019/06]
English:MODULAR BONE MODEL[2019/06]
French:MODÈLE D'OS MODULAIRE[2019/06]
Entry into regional phase29.10.2018National basic fee paid 
29.10.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
29.10.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.10.2018Examination requested  [2019/06]
29.10.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
24.05.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201903   M06   Fee paid on   13.05.2019
Cited inInternational search[XYI]US2013230838  (IANNOTTI JOSEPH P [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-8,11-14,16-18,20-23 * paragraphs [0005] , [0068] - [0123] * [Y] 5,9,10,15 [I] 19;
 [XA]WO2008109751  (CLEVELAND CLINIC FOUNDATION [US]) [X] 1,4,7,8,11,14,18,20,21 * page 4, line 4 - page 5, line 4 * * page 6, line 1 - page 7, line 7 * * page 8, line 23 - page 12, line 25 * [A] 2,3,5,6,9,10,12,13,15-17,19,22,23;
 [Y]WO2012003175  (SYNTHES USA LLC [US], et al) [Y] 5,15 * paragraph [0005] *;
 [Y]WO2014070681  (ELLIPSE TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [Y] 5,15 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US7416565  (AL-TURAIKL MOHMMED H S [SA]) [Y] 9,10 * page 4, lines 6-15; figure 2 *