Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3420161

EP3420161 - STRUCTURE WITH HOLLOW OR PARTIALLY HOLLOW STRUCTURAL ELEMENTS, WITH MODULAR AND IMPROVED SYSTEM OF JOINTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  30.11.2018
Database last updated on 21.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.09.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  25.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.04.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 29.05.2019  [2019/22]
26.04.2019Change - extension statespublished on 29.05.2019  [2019/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Esdra SRL Unipersonale
Via Argine San Marco 2
30016 Jesolo (VE) / IT
[2019/01]
Inventor(s)01 / AMADARDO, Gianfranco
c/o Esdra Srl Unipersonale
Via Argine San Marco 2
30016 Jesolo (VE) / IT
 [2019/01]
Representative(s)Vinci, Marcello
Ufficio Veneto Brevetti Via Sorio 116
35141 Padova / IT
[2019/01]
Application number, filing date17717221.020.02.2017
[2019/01]
WO2017IB50951
Priority number, dateIT2016UB0097423.02.2016         Original published format: IT UB20160974
[2019/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017145039
Date:31.08.2017
Language:EN
[2017/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3420161
Date:02.01.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.08.2017
[2019/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP31.08.2017
ClassificationInternational:E04H15/34, A47B47/00, E04F10/00, F16B12/00, E04B1/19
[2019/01]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/01]
TitleGerman:STRUKTUR MIT HOHLEN ODER TEILWEISE HOHLEN BAUELEMENTEN MIT MODULAREM UND VERBESSERTEM VERBINDUNGSSYSTEM[2019/01]
English:STRUCTURE WITH HOLLOW OR PARTIALLY HOLLOW STRUCTURAL ELEMENTS, WITH MODULAR AND IMPROVED SYSTEM OF JOINTS[2019/01]
French:STRUCTURE À ÉLÉMENTS STRUCTURELS CREUX OU PARTIELLEMENT CREUX ET À SYSTÈME MODULAIRE ET AMÉLIORÉ DE JOINTS[2019/01]
Entry into regional phase20.09.2018National basic fee paid 
20.09.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
20.09.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.09.2018Examination requested  [2019/01]
20.09.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
03.04.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2011194892  (HUANG SZ-LUNG [TW]) [X] 1-8,10,11 * page 1, column l, paragraph 2 * * page 1, column r, paragraph 25 - page 2, column l, paragraph 30; figures 1-7 * [Y] 13,14;
 [X]WO2007082962  (BSW ANLAGENBAU GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-6,9-12 * page 8, line 4 - line 11 * * page 11, line 13 - page 12, line 8; figures 1,6 *;
 [YA]DE2709421  (SERBERT IND PROPRIETARY LTD) [Y] 13,14 * page 4, line 9 - page 7, line 4; figures 1-5 * [A] 1,3,4,7,8,10,11;
 [A]US5224307  (LUKOS STEPHEN P [US]) [A] 1,3,4,13,14 * column 3, line 4 - column 4, line 53; figures 1-3,5 *